Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINTELIMAP, INC. v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00037
Date Filed2019-01-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffINTELIMAP, INC.
Case DescriptionIntelimap, Inc. submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission through FOI Services for records concerning communications between the director of the SEC's Division of Trading and Markets and a list of named individuals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Intelimap filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-081COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5875413) filed by INTELIMAP, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INTELIMAP, INC. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-09Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-075Joint MOTION to Stay Case by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 5 Joint Motion to Stay Case, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted with respect to the parties' request for an extension of time for the defendant to file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 14, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 5/10/2019, (hs) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar