Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00039
Date Filed2019-01-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffEARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Earth Island Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning 23 public meetings held by the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After several attempts to inquire about the status of its request, the agency told EII that it would not charge fees for records released on a rolling, interim basis. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, EII filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5875642) filed by Earth Island Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Babcock, Hope) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-082CIVIL COVER SHEET by Earth Island Institute re 1 Complaint filed by Earth Island Institute. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Earth Island Institute.(Babcock, Hope) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/9/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-083REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by Earth Island Institute. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Earth Island Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Babcock, Hope) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-084LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Earth Island Institute (Babcock, Hope) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-09Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-095SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zef, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Attorney Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit US Attorney General Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit U.S. Department of the Interior Proof of Service)(Babcock, Hope) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-087STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/8/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-118ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-12MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the Report on or before March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/12/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar