Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMalik et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityCleveland
Case Number1:2019cv00059
Date Filed2019-01-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr
PlaintiffDavid Malik
PlaintiffEsperanza Pacheo Padilla
Case DescriptionDavid Mallick, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's detention policies. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Mallick filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-091Complaint with jury demand against Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9086579. Filed by David Malik, Esperanza Pacheo Padilla. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Confirmation) (Malik, David) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-09Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (S,SR) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-09Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-092Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-09Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See General Order 2019-1 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/2019. (S,SR) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-313Motion to lift stay filed by David Malik, Esperanza Pacheo Padilla. (Markovich, Anna) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar