Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHuman Rights Watch v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv00172
Date Filed2019-01-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte
PlaintiffHuman Rights Watch
Case DescriptionHuman Rights Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for anonymized records of individuals arrested, booked, or detained during law enforcement operation or investigations conducted by ICE or U.S. Customs and Border Protection. Human Rights Watch also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Human Rights Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-101COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12990428.). Filed byHuman Rights Watch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2019) Modified on 1/11/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-102Certificate of Interested Entities by Human Rights Watch (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2019) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-103Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-104Proposed Summons. (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2019) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-105Proposed Summons. (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2019) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-106Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/10/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-117Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-118Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-249CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Human Rights Watch.. (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 1/24/2019) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar