Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00070
Date Filed2019-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed reporter Chris Geidner submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records of the formal documentation of Matthew Whitaker as Acting Attorney General. DOJ referred Geidner to the White House, which told him that there was formal documentation of Whitaker's appointment but that it would not provide it to Geidner. Buzzfeed also requested disclosure forms Whitaker was required to fill out under the Ethics in Government Act, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Buzzfeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5884664) filed by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Geidner Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Geidner Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit C - Tillman Request, # 4 Exhibit D - Tillman Acknowledgment, # 5 Exhibit E - DEO Correspondence, # 6 Exhibit F - JMD Correspondence, # 7 Exhibit G - Subsequent JMD Correspondence, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons)(Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-15Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-153STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/15/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-164LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/22/2019. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/23/2019. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/23/2019 (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-238ERRATA (Date of Receipt of Summonses) by BUZZFEED, INC. 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, 6 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-299NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar