Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSAVAGE v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00074
Date Filed2019-01-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffLEN SAVAGE
Case DescriptionLen Savage, a firearms dealer in Georgia, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning the use of bump-stocks during the commission of a crime. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and provided some records to Savage. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Savage filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-141COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5885587) filed by LEN SAVAGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Foia to ATF 4.9.2018, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, # 3 Summons Proposed Summons on ATF, # 4 Summons Proposed Summons on US Atty General, # 5 Summons Proposed Summons on US Attorney)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/16/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-16Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-273RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES served on 1/22/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/22/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/21/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Proof on CPC, # 2 Summons Proof of Service on Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit USPS Proof on Attorney General, # 4 Summons Proof of Service on ATF, # 5 Exhibit USPS proof on ATF)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 01/27/2019)
2019-02-084NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-125NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Fraser Knapp on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES Substituting for attorney Jason T. Cohen (Knapp, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar