Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOsen LLC v. Office of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv00405
Date Filed2019-01-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alison J. Nathan
PlaintiffOsen LLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Osen LLC submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning the designation packages for designations of Sanabil, rhe Al-Salah Society, and Al-Waqfiya. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Osen LLC that it was referring the request to the Office of Foreign Assets Control. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Osen LLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-151COMPLAINT against Office of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16191590)Document filed by Osen LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A/Sanabil Designation, # 2 Exhibit B/Al-Salah Designation, # 3 Exhibit C/Waqfiya Designation, # 4 Exhibit D/FOIA Request, # 5 Exhibit E/9-25-18 Initial Response Letter, # 6 Exhibit F/10-5-18 Initial Response Letter)(Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-152CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-153RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Osen LLC.(Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-154FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of Foreign Assets Control U.S. Department of the Treasury, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Osen LLC. (Gielchinsky, Dina) Modified on 1/16/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-16CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-16Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-16Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-165NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Adam Friedman on behalf of Osen LLC. (Friedman, William) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-16***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dina Gielchinsky to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on 'as to' docket entry text does not exactly match initial pleading caption; party name on the PDF 'To' section does not exactly match initial pleading caption; second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o or via';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-166REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSETS CONTROL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Osen LLC. (Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-167NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, May 10, 2019 at 3:30pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Initial Conference set for 5/10/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/16/2019) (kv) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-178ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury. (dnh) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-089SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Office of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury served on 2/5/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Osen LLC. (Gielchinsky, Dina) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-1410NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Salim Jacob on behalf of Office of Foreign Assets Control of the U.S. Department of Treasury. (Jacob, Charles) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar