Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMermelstein v. United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityCentral Islip
Case Number2:2019cv00312
Date Filed2019-01-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Denis R. Hurley
PlaintiffJoeseph Mermelstein
Case DescriptionJoseph Mermelstein submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself. The agency told Mermelstein that it had located 2,156 responsive pages which could be released on CDs for a cost of $70. The agency told Mermelstein's attorney that it would take five years to disclose all the records, but the agency could disclose 720 pages within two years. Mermelstein rejected that offer. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-161COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joeseph Mermelstein. (Cox, Dwayne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2019: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne). (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-162Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-16FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 26968 (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-173In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-174MOTION to Stay respectfully submitted on consent by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Knapp, James) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-18ORDER granting 4 Motion to Stay: The government's application, made with the consent of the plaintiff, to stay this matter due to the lapse in appropriations is granted. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 1/18/2019. (Gapinski, Michele) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-315STATUS REPORT respectfully submitted to advise the Court that appropriations to the Department of Justice have been restored and requesting a lift of the stay by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation (Knapp, James) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar