Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00096
Date Filed2019-01-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted two FOIA requests to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning the revised Payday Rule and any litigation brought to challenge it. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told Public Citizen that it would hold its fee waiver request in abeyance. The agency also told Public Citizen that it had located potentially responsive records to the first request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-171COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5892158) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to the U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, # 4 Summons to the Attorney General)(Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-17Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/16/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/23/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 1/24/2019 (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar