Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company, et al v. Department of Transportation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv00540
Date Filed2019-01-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Katherine Polk Failla
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company,
PlaintiffBenjamin Protess
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Benjamin Protess submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for emails sent to or from senior officials to eop.gov addresses that contained keywords pertaining to Trump businesses. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Transportation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-181COMPLAINT against Department of Transportation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16212138)Document filed by The New York Times Company,, Benjamin Protess.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-182CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-183RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc. for The New York Times Company,. Document filed by The New York Times Company,.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-184FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Transportation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Protess, The New York Times Company,. (McCraw, David) Modified on 1/22/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-22CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-22Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-22Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-22***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Edward McCraw to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. The incorrect PDF was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-225REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Transportation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Protess, The New York Times Company,. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-236ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Transportation. (dnh) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-307NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 2, 2019, at 4:30 p.m., in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 618, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/30/2019) (rjm) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar