Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00165
Date Filed2019-01-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning communications between three named officials and five members of the House Financial Services Committee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told AO that it would need an advance payment of $1,288 to process the request or it would administratively close the request after 30 days. AO filed an administrative appeal. The agency granted AO's appeal and remanded its request for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-251COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5906871) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons CFPB)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-25Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-254STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/25/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-02-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/28/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/27/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/4/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 2/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar