Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-22 | | Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 01/22/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT & PRIVACY STAFF filed by FELIX CASTRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-22 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FELIX CASTRO (zef, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-22 | 3 | PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by FELIX CASTRO (zef, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-02-26 | 4 | ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $18.94 from Prison Account of FELIX CASTRO and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/26/2019. (zmd) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | | Case to Judge Randolph D. Moss. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | 5 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/27/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-03-04 | 6 | SUMMONS (3) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT & PRIVACY STAFF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 03/04/2019) |
2019-04-01 | | Partial Filing Fee Received from Felix Castro in the amount of $18.94, receipt number: 4616097383. (ztd) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT & PRIVACY STAFF (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-05-01 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/24/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/24/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/22/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT & PRIVACY STAFF served on 4/24/2019 (zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-10 | | Partial Filing Fee Received from FELIX CASTRO in the amount of $11.33, receipt number: 4616097967. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-05-23 | 9 | STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/24/2019..... ANSWER to 1 Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT & PRIVACY STAFF.(Rogers, Joshua) Modified on 5/24/2019 (kt). (Entered: 05/23/2019) |
2019-05-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: On May 23, 2019 Defendant filed an "answer" to Plaintiff's complaint, Dkt. 9. The document filed, however, appears to be a copy of Plaintiff's complaint, Dkt. 1. It is accordingly ORDERED that Dkt. 9 be STRICKEN and it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall re-file an answer on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/24/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/24/2019. (kt) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 10 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT & PRIVACY STAFF.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before June 11, 2019, Defendant shall file a proposed schedule addressing (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response on or before July 2, 2019, indicating whether he agrees with the proposed schedule and, if not, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/28/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Schedule due by 6/11/2019; Response due by 7/2/2019. (kt) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-06-12 | 11 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT & PRIVACY STAFF (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2019) |
2019-06-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion for extension of time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The proposed schedule is DEEMED FILED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this matter: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion on or before July 26, 2019; Plaintiff shall file a response on or before September 9, 2019; and Defendant shall file a reply on or before October 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/13/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 7/26/2019. Response to Dispositive Motion due by 9/9/2019. Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 10/9/2019. (dot) (Entered: 06/14/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-07-09 | | Partial Filing Fee Received from FELIX CASTRO in the amount of $7.92, receipt number: 4616099390. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/11/2019) |
2019-07-18 | 12 | MOTION to Compel by FELIX CASTRO (ztd) (Entered: 07/25/2019) |
2019-07-25 | 14 | MOTION to Compel re MINUTE ORDER filed on 05/28/2019 by FELIX CASTRO."Let this be filed as a Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with the Court's May 28, 2019 Order" Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 07/25/2019 (jf) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-07-26 | 13 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT & PRIVACY STAFF (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/26/2019) |
2019-08-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court finds that Defendant is in compliance with its May 28, 2019 Order. Accordingly, Plaintiff's 14 Motion is DENIED. It also appears that Plaintiff has not received all filings in this matter. As a result, it is ORDERED that Defendant shall mail the current docket and all of Defendant's filings to date to Plaintiff at his address on record. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 1, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-13 | | Partial Filing Fee Received from FELIX CASTRO in the amount of $87.80, receipt number: 4616100190. (zrdj) (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2019-08-15 | 15 | ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment by August 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 15, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-08-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response To Defendant's 13 Motion For Summary Judgment due by 8/29/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/16/2019) |
2019-09-13 | | Partial Filing Fee Received from FELIX CASTRO in the amount of $6.03, receipt number: 4616100613. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 16 | Order directing Plaintiff to show cause. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 30, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-09-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's response to Show Cause Order due by 10/25/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/04/2019) |
2019-12-10 | | Partial Filing Fee Received from FELIX CASTRO in the amount of $21.30, receipt number: 4616101728. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-23 | 17 | ORDER dismissing case for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 23, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/23/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |