Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-23 | | Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 01/23/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-23 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by MICHAEL CHAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-23 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL CHAVIS (zef, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-02-07 | 3 | FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 02/07/2019. (zsb) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 4 | SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-26 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/26/2019) |
2019-03-08 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/21/2019. (ztd) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 7 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by April 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/21/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/4/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/25/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/25/19. (ztd) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-04 | 9 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule by MICHAEL CHAVIS (Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-04 | 10 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' 10 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing by May 6, 2019. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/4/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/6/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 04/10/2019) |
2019-05-01 | 11 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 4/23/2019 (zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-06 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a joint proposed schedule for production or briefing by June 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/7/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/07/2019) |
2019-05-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule for Production or Briefing Schedule due by 6/6/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 05/07/2019) |
2019-06-04 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further status report by September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/7/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/16/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/16/2019) |
2019-09-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 20, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/20/2019) |
2019-09-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/22/2019) |
2019-11-18 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/18/2019) |
2019-12-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before December 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 11, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2019-12-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before January 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 23, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/23/2019) |
2019-12-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/24/2019) |
2020-01-21 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before February 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 28, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/28/2020) |
2020-01-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/21/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/30/2020) |
2020-02-10 | 18 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney SCOTT SROKA (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/10/2020) |
2020-02-21 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by MICHAEL CHAVIS. (Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/21/2020) |
2020-03-02 | | VACATED PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER OF 3/30/2020....MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 2, 2020. (lccjn3) Modified on 4/2/2020 (zcdw). (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/30/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
2020-03-25 | 20 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 3/26/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-03-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' 20 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order and 20 Motion for a Stay and Extension of the Processing, Production, and Reporting Deadlines, and considering that they are unopposed, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motions are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this action is STAYED and that the Court's March 2, 2020 Order requiring a Joint Status Report to be submitted on or before March 30, 2020 is VACATED: Defendants shall submit a Status Report on or before April 30, 2020, and every thirty days thereafter, apprising the Court of FBI's Record/Information Dissemination Section and, if operations have resumed, proposing a revised schedule for further proceeding. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 30, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-03-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 4/30/2020. Case Stayed. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-30 | 21 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/30/2020) |
2020-05-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of Defendants' 21 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall submit an additional Status Report on or before June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 5, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
2020-05-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 6/1/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/05/2020) |
2020-06-03 | 22 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/03/2020) |
2020-06-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of Defendants' 22 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall submit an additional Status Report on or before July 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 06/15/2020) |
2020-06-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 06/17/2020) |
2020-07-01 | 23 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-07-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of Defendants' 23 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall submit an additional Status Report on or before August 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 7, 2020.(lccjn3) (Entered: 07/07/2020) |
2020-07-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 07/08/2020) |
2020-08-03 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/03/2020) |
2020-08-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of Defendants' 24 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before September 8, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the stay in this matter is lifted. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 28, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 08/28/2020) |
2020-08-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 08/28/2020) |
2020-09-08 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/08/2020) |
2020-10-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 25 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 8, 2020 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 1, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/01/2020) |
2020-10-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/01/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2020-10-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 26 Joint Status Report, it hereby ORDERED that the Parities shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by November 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 9, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/09/2020) |
2020-10-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/09/2020) |
2020-11-09 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 27 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by December 8, 2020 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 18, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 11/18/2020) |
2020-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 11/18/2020) |
2020-12-07 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/07/2020) |
2020-12-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 28 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that they shall submit another Joint Status Report by January 19, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 8, 2020.(lccjn3) (Entered: 12/08/2020) |
2020-12-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 12/08/2020) |
2021-01-19 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 29 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties' request for a briefing schedule is GRANTED. The Court thus adopts the following briefing schedule: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by April 5, 2021 ; Plaintiff shall file its Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by May 5, 2021 ; Defendant shall Reply by May 26, 2021 ; and Plaintiff shall Reply by June 16, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 22, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/22/2021) |
2021-01-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/5/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/5/2021. Cross Motions due by 5/5/2021. Response to Cross Motions due by 5/26/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/26/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 6/16/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 01/25/2021) |
2021-03-29 | 30 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/29/2021) |
2021-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Defendant's 30 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Court thus adopts the following amended briefing schedule: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by April 21, 2021; Plaintiff shall file its Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by May 21, 2021; Defendant shall Reply by June 14, 2021; and Plaintiff shall Reply by July 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 12, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 04/12/2021) |
2021-04-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/21/2021. Cross Motions due by 5/21/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/21/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/14/2021. Response to Cross Motions due by 6/14/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/5/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 04/12/2021) |
2021-04-21 | 31 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Seidel Decl.)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/21/2021) |
2021-05-20 | 32 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment and File Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by MICHAEL CHAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and File Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2021) |
2021-06-01 | 33 | Memorandum in opposition to re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL CHAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A - Declaration of Gretta Wright, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/01/2021) |
2021-06-01 | 34 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by MICHAEL CHAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A - Declaration of Gretta Wright, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 06/01/2021) |
2021-06-18 | 35 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/18/2021) |
2021-06-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendants' 35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall thus file its Reply/Opposition by July 8, 2021, and Plaintiff shall Reply by July 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 21, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 06/21/2021) |
2021-06-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 7/8/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/29/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/8/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 06/22/2021) |
2021-07-08 | 36 | Memorandum in opposition to re 34 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/08/2021) |
2021-07-08 | 37 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/08/2021) |
2021-07-29 | 38 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL CHAVIS. (Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2021) |
2021-08-24 | 39 | NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Hansen Chavis on behalf of MICHAEL CHAVIS (Chavis, Dana) (Entered: 08/24/2021) |
2021-08-24 | 40 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MICHAEL CHAVIS. Attorney Stephen Michael Kissinger terminated. (Chavis, Dana) (Entered: 08/24/2021) |
2021-09-02 | 41 | NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Parker Ihnen on behalf of MICHAEL CHAVIS (Ihnen, Luke) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2021-09-02 | 42 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MICHAEL CHAVIS. Attorney Dana Hansen Chavis terminated. (Ihnen, Luke) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2023-05-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report, by June 8, 2023, in which the Parties shall inform the Court of whether this matter remains live, and whether the Parties otherwise continue to seek resolution of the issues presented in this case, in light of the status of the litigation regarding Plaintiff's FOIA request for FBI records in Chavis v. U.S. Department of Justice, et al. , No. 22-cv-618 (TJK), or any other pending litigation regarding related FOIA requests. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 25, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 05/25/2023) |
2023-06-08 | 43 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/08/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |