Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5912056) filed by CENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to the CFPB, # 3 Summons to the Attorney General, # 4 Summons to the U.S. Attorney)(Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 3 | Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-29 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/28/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/29/2019) |
2019-02-11 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/4/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/11/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 7 | GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/15/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-18 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 2/14/2019 (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/18/2019) |
2019-02-22 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/22/2019) |
2019-02-22 | 10 | NOTICE of Processing and Disclosure Completion by CENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/22/2019) |
2019-02-22 | 11 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/22/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |