Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleChatman v. Secretary of Defense et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2019cv00459
Date Filed2019-01-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Steve C. Jones
PlaintiffMichael Chatman
Case DescriptionMichael Chatman filed suit against the Department of Defense concerning allegations of workplace harassment during his tour in Afghanistan. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantSecretary of Defense
DefendantKenneth Holdcraft
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-281COMPLAINT filed by Michael Chatman. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 109714) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-302NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 1/30/2019. (rjs) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-30Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Chatman re 2 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (rjs) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-05Notification of Docket Correction: Magistrate Judge King Referred In Error (aar) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar