Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union v. Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv00903
Date Filed2019-01-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Edgardo Ramos
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning changes to the Title X family planning program. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [17]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-301COMPLAINT against Department of Health and Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16264587)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-302CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-303RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-304REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Health and Human Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brigitte Adrienne Amiri. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-315ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Health and Human Services. (jgo) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-256AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Department of Health and Human Services served on 2/7/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Amiri, Brigitte) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-047NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachael Lightfoot Doud on behalf of Department of Health and Human Services. (Doud, Rachael) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-118ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Department of Health and Human Services.(Doud, Rachael) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-04-029NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meagan Burrows on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union. (Burrows, Meagan) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-09-0410JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Meagan Burrows dated 9.4.2019 re: Case Status and Production Schedule. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(Burrows, Meagan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-0511NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (kv) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-1212JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Meagan Burrows dated 9/12/2019. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union.(Burrows, Meagan) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-1313ORDER granting 12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The October 4 initial conference is adjourned to February 20, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2020-02-1414SECOND LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Meagan Burrows dated February 14, 2020. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Burrows, Meagan) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-1815ORDER granting 14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The February 20 initial pretrial conference is adjourned to June 4, 2020, at 3:30 PM. (Initial Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-06-0216LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Meagan Burrows dated June 2, 2020. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union..(Burrows, Meagan) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-0217ORDER granting 16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The June 4 initial pretrial conference is adjourned to October 1, 2020 at 11 AM. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/2/2020) (va) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar