Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-02-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT receipt number 0752-15435432 filed by Reed Beidler; (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 02/01/2019) |
2019-02-01 | 2 | CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 02/01/2019) |
2019-02-01 | 3 | ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Reed Beidler by Casey T. Grabenstein (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 02/01/2019) |
2019-02-01 | | CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 02/01/2019) |
2019-02-04 | | SUMMONS Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of Treasury. (dal, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019) |
2019-02-04 | 4 | NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019) |
2019-02-04 | 5 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 4/10/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019) |
2019-03-04 | 6 | DESIGNATION of Nigel B Cooney as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Dept. of the Treasury (Cooney, Nigel) (Entered: 03/04/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 7 | EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Reed Beidler Exhibit 1 regarding complaint 1 (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 8 | EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Reed Beidler Exhibit 2 regarding complaint 1 (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 9 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reed Beidler as to Internal Revenue Service on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 10 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reed Beidler as to United States Dept. of the Treasury on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 11 | MOTION by Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Dept. of the Treasury for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-04 | 12 | Defendants' Department of Treasury and IRS NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Edward Hunsader for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 11 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-05 | 13 | STATUS Report jointly filed by Plaintiff and Defendants by Internal Revenue Service, United States Dept. of the Treasury (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-04-08 | 14 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer 11 is granted. Defendants' response to the complaint is due 4/30/19. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Status hearing on 4/10/19 is stricken and reset to 7/10/19 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a status report by 6/30/19. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 15 | MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United States Dept. of the Treasury , MOTION by Defendant United States Dept. of the Treasury to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 16 | ANSWER to Complaint by Internal Revenue Service(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 17 | MOTION by Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Dept. of the Treasury to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Count I of the complaint alleging Privacy Act claim , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Dept. of the Treasury (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 18 | NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Edward Hunsader for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, 15 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 17 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/7/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-05-03 | 19 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The briefing schedule on defendants' motions to dismiss 15 17 is as follows: plaintiff's response is due 5/24/19; defendants' reply 6/7/19. No appearance on 5/7/19 is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-17 | 20 | MOTION by Plaintiff Reed Beidler to stay briefing on defs' motion dismiss (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-05-17 | 21 | NOTICE of Motion by Casey T. Grabenstein for presentment of motion to stay 20 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/23/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-05-21 | 22 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to stay 20 is granted, and the briefing schedule on the motions to dismiss 15 17 is stayed. The parties shall report on the resolution of the case in a status report by 7/1/19. No appearance on 5/23/19 is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 23 | STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 24 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal 23 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without fees or costs to either party. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 25 | NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Reed Beidler. (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 26 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The minute entry date 5/29/19 24 is corrected to read as follows: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal 23 , defendant United States Dept. of the Treasury is dismissed from this action with prejudice, and without fees or costs to either party. This case remains pending as to plaintiff's claims against the Internal Revenue Service. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 27 | STATUS Report / Joint Status Report by Reed Beidler (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-02 | 28 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 10/9/2019 at 09:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-10-09 | 29 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. The deadlines in this case remain stayed. By 1/15/20, the parties shall file a status report on document production with a proposed deadline for completion of the government's production. The court will enter a responsive order. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019) |
2020-01-15 | 30 | STATUS Report by Reed Beidler (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-01-15 | 31 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The litigation remains stayed while the IRS continues to produce responsive documents. The parties shall file another status report by 3/31/20. The court will consider plaintiff's request for an order compelling completion of the government's production by 7/15/20 after it reviews the progress made by 3/31/20. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020) |
2020-03-16 | 32 | ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020) |
2020-03-30 | 33 | ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-04-24 | 34 | ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020) |
2020-05-19 | 35 | STATUS Report by Reed Beidler (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 05/19/2020) |
2020-05-19 | 36 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file a status report on 7/1/20 with an update on the progress of the government's production and a statement of whether the production will be complete by 8/1/20. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 05/19/2020) |
2020-05-26 | 37 | ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-07-01 | 38 | STATUS Report jointly filed by the parties by Internal Revenue Service (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-07-01 | 39 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file an updated status report or dismissal papers by 8/14/20. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-07-10 | 40 | ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk4, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020) |
2020-08-14 | 41 | STATUS Report Updated by Reed Beidler (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 08/14/2020) |
2020-08-14 | 42 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff shall file an updated status report or a notice of voluntary dismissal by 8/28/20. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 08/14/2020) |
2020-08-28 | 43 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Reed Beidler (Grabenstein, Casey) (Entered: 08/28/2020) |
2020-08-28 | 44 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal 43 , this case is dismissed without prejudice and without costs. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |