Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSkertich v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of Indiana
CityHammond
Case Number2:2019cv00055
Date Filed2019-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge James T Moody
PlaintiffRobert Skertich
Case DescriptionRobert Skertich submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning allegations that he was defrauded out of $500,000 and had previously met with FBI agents pertaining to the allegations. After the agency failed to respond, Skertich filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-061PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Federal Bureau of Investigation, filed by Robert Skertich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7) (rmf) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-062MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Skertich. (rmf) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-083ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the payment of the filing fee; DIRECTING the USMS to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 2/8/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party & USMS)(jld) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-114Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (jld) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar