Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlliance for the Wild Rockies v. U.S. Forest Service
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityMissoula
Case Number9:2019cv00030
Date Filed2019-02-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dana L. Christensen
PlaintiffAlliance for the Wild Rockies
Case DescriptionThe Alliance for the Wild Rockies submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Forest Service for records concerning the project file for the Ten Mile-South Helena Project. The agency eventually contacted the Alliance and asked for an extension of time. The Alliance declined to provide an extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Alliance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Forest Service an agency within the U.S. Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-081COMPLAINT against U.S. Forest Service, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-082Summons Issued as to U.S. Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Originals mailed to plaintiff's counsel (KJL) . (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-08Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2261909 (KJL) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-123PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/9/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/9/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/9/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/12/2019. (TCL) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-03-144STIPULATION of Dismissal by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar