Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRobbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityCentral Islip
Case Number2:2019cv00933
Date Filed2019-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William F. Kuntz, II
PlaintiffRobbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the agency's investigation of Hertz. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (ongoing investigation or proceeding). However, alleging that the investigation had now been closed, the law firm resubmitted its original request. The agency again denied the request under Exemption 7(A). The agency also told the law firm that it could file suit. The agency then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Securities and Exchange Commission
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-151COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against United States Securities and Exchange Commission filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11206203 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5) (Capeci, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-152Proposed Summons. Re 1 Complaint, by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (Capeci, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-193This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-19Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-194In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-195Summons Issued as to United States Securities and Exchange Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-206AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney General Letitia James & United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York, Richard P. Donoghue on February 19, 2019, filed by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. (Capeci, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-207SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. United States Securities and Exchange Commission served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Capeci, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-03-08Case randomly reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Judge Joseph F. Bianco, Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-088In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-229ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Lipari, Vincent) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2210SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., in Courtroom 2E North located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document.) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 4/10/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 3/22/2019. (Several, Emily) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar