Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStecz-Hunter v. United States Department of Education et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityFort Worth
Case Number4:2019cv00142
Date Filed2019-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reed C. O'Connor
PlaintiffPhyllis Darlene Stecz-Hunter
Case DescriptionPhyllis Stecz-Hunter received a notice from the Department of Education that her wages were being garnished to help pay back her student loan. Stecz-Hunter submitted a FOIA request to the agency for a complete copy of her promissory note. The agency claimed the records had been sent to her, but Stecz-Hunter said she had not received them. After failing to come to terms with the agency, Stecz-Hunter filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Department of Education
DefendantAllied Interstate LLC
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-151Plaintiff's Original COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate LLC, United States Department of Education filed by Phyllis Darlene Stecz-Hunter. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number FW032185) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-152Summons issued as to Allied Interstate LLC, United States Department of Education, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (wrb) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-153New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-154Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-15***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. cy to Stecz-Hunter Fri Feb 15 12:02:46 CST 2019 (crt) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-255SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to All Defendants as to All Defendants. (Stecz-Hunter, Phyllis) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-126NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anna-Katrina S Christakis on behalf of Allied Interstate LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-127Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allied Interstate LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-148Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States Department of Education (Civins-DOJ, Braden) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-159ORDER granting 7 Defendant Allied Interstate LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead and 8 Defendant United States Department of Education's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Accordingly, Defendants are therefore ORDERED to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 22, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/15/2019) (skg) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-1510ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before April 12, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/15/2019) (skg) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar