Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUNTER v. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00353
Date Filed2019-02-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffPAUL GUNTER
Case DescriptionPaul Gunter, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gunter filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-08Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 2/8/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE filed by PAUL GUNTER.(zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PAUL GUNTER (zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-083PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by PAUL GUNTER (zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-284ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $42.33 from Prison Account of PAUL GUNTER and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/27/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-06Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-085SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar