Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Innocence Project, Inc. v. National Museum of Health and Medicine et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv01574
Date Filed2019-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alison J. Nathan
PlaintiffThe Innocence Project, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Innocence Project asked the National Museum of Health and Medicine, operated by the Department of Defense, for permission to visit its archives to research bite-mark analysis. The agency refused permission and the Innocence Project filed FOIA requests with the Museum. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Innocence Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Museum of Health and Medicine
DefendantDefense Health Agency
DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantLaura Cutter Archivist of the National Museum of Health and Medicine, in her official capacity
DefendantDavid Shackelford Curator of the National Museum of Health and Medicine, in his official capacity
DefendantAdrianne Noe Director of the National Museum of Health and Medicine, in her official capacity
DefendantRaquel Bono Director of the Defense Health Agency, in her official capacity
DefendantPatrick Shanahan Acting Secretary of Defense, in his official capacity
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [47]
Opinion/Order [49]
Opinion/Order [51]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-201FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick M Shanahan. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16373833)Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B-DHA email on 4/20/18, # 3 Exhibit C-DHA email on 6/26/18, # 4 Exhibit D-Innocence Project letter of 2/13/19, # 5 Exhibit E-DHA response of 2/14/19, # 6 Exhibit F-Innocence Project letter on 2/18/19)(Manes, Jonathan) Modified on 2/21/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-202CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-203FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Museum of Health and Medicine; Defense Health Agency; Department of Defense; Laura Cutter; David Shackelford; Adrianne Noe; Raquel Bono; Patrick Shanahan, re: 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Defense Health Agency, # 2 Department of Defense, # 3 Laura Cutter, # 4 David Shackelford, # 5 Adrianne Noe, # 6 Raquel Bono, # 7 Patrick Shanahan)(Manes, Jonathan) Modified on 2/21/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-204RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc..(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Matthew Manes. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Laura Cutter; David Shackelford; Adrianne Noe; Raquel Bono; Patrick Shanahan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Matthew Manes to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Matthew Manes. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:551;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 05:552;. (jgo) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Matthew Manes to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each Request for Issuance of Summons must be filed separately OR one PDF may be used with a 'rider' attached;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-03-055NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, July 19, 2019 at 3:30pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/5/2019) (kv) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-066COMPLAINT against Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick Shanahan. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - DHA Email on 4/20/18, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - DHA Email on 6/26/18, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Innocence Project letter of 2/13/19, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - DHA Response of 2/14/19, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Innocence Project Letter on 2/18/19)(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-067REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Museum of Health and Medicine, re: 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-068REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defense Health Agency, re: 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-069REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0610REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Laura Cutter, re: 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0611REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Shackelford, re: 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0612REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Adrianne Noe, re: 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0613REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raquel Bono, re: 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0614REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patrick Shanahan, re: 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-0715ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Museum of Health and Medicine. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0716ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defense Health Agency. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0717ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Defense. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0718ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laura Cutter. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0719ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Shackelford. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0720ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adrianne Noe. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0721ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raquel Bono. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0722ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrick Shanahan. (dnh) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-1123ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for Friday, July 19, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. is hereby rescheduled to Friday, July 26, 2019 at 3:15 p.m. Initial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/11/2019) (kv) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-04-0324AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Raquel Bono served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Laura Cutter served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Defense Health Agency served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Department of Defense served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; National Museum of Health and Medicine served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Adrianne Noe served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; David Shackelford served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Patrick Shanahan served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Summons -Receipts of Registered Mail)(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-1825NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick Shanahan. (Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-1926LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 6 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 4/19/2019. Document filed by Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick Shanahan.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-1927ORDER granting 26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 6 Complaint. SO ORDERED. Raquel Bono answer due 5/22/2019; Laura Cutter answer due 5/22/2019; Defense Health Agency answer due 5/22/2019; Department of Defense answer due 5/22/2019; National Museum of Health and Medicine answer due 5/22/2019; Adrianne Noe answer due 5/22/2019; David Shackelford answer due 5/22/2019; Patrick Shanahan answer due 5/22/2019 (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/19/2019) (kv) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-05-2128CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 6 Complaint,, . Document filed by Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick Shanahan.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-2329ORDER granting 28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 6 Complaint. SO ORDERED. Raquel Bono answer due 6/21/2019; Laura Cutter answer due 6/21/2019; Defense Health Agency answer due 6/21/2019; Department of Defense answer due 6/21/2019; National Museum of Health and Medicine answer due 6/21/2019; Adrianne Noe answer due 6/21/2019; David Shackelford answer due 6/21/2019; Patrick Shanahan answer due 6/21/2019. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/22/2019) (kv) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-06-2030CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 6 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 6/20/2019. Document filed by Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick Shanahan.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-2131ORDER granting 30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 6 Complaint. No further extensions. SO ORDERED. Raquel Bono answer due 7/8/2019; Laura Cutter answer due 7/8/2019; Defense Health Agency answer due 7/8/2019; Department of Defense answer due 7/8/2019; National Museum of Health and Medicine answer due 7/8/2019; Adrianne Noe answer due 7/8/2019; David Shackelford answer due 7/8/2019; Patrick Shanahan answer due 7/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/20/2019) (kv) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-07-0832ANSWER to 6 Complaint,,. Document filed by Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick Shanahan.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-1933JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 7/19/2019 re: letter re Initial Pretrial Conference and proposed order. Document filed by Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick Shanahan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-2434NOTICE of Law Student Intern Appearance Form. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-2535MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 33 Letter, filed by Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Adrianne Noe, Patrick Shanahan, National Museum of Health and Medicine, David Shackelford. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for July 26, 2019 is hereby adjourned sine die. By September 30, 2019, the parties shall file a statusupdate concerning next steps in this matter. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/25/2019) (cf) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-2536PRIVACY ACT ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/25/2019) (cf) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-10-1537ORDER re: 35 Memo Endorsement. According to the Court's Order dated July 25, 2019, a status update was due by September 30, 2019. Dkt. No. 35. As of the date of this Order, the Court is not in receipt of this status update. The parties are hereby ordered to submit the status update by October 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/15/2019) (kv) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-1638MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM: ENDORSEMENT: I certify that this student: John S. Zakour (a) has completed at least two semesters of law school work and is a participant in an approved clinical program;(b) is qualified, to the best of my knowledge, to provide the legal representation permitted by this rule. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/15/2019) (js) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-1739STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report and Plaintiff's Unopposed Request for an Order Authorizing Disclosure of One Document Subject to the Protective Order Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc..(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-1740PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. Related Document Number: 39 . (Manes, Jonathan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-1741LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 10/17/2019 re: Plaintiff's request for an order from the Court. Document filed by Raquel Bono, Laura Cutter, Defense Health Agency, Department of Defense, National Museum of Health and Medicine, Adrianne Noe, David Shackelford, Patrick Shanahan.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-17***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 40 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-2142ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to show cause why the Court should not grant an order that only allows Plaintiff to file the document in question under seal in its client's state post-conviction proceeding. This order would not prevent the court in the state post-conviction proceeding from ordering further disclosure of the document. The parties shall submit a joint filing by October 28, 2019. To the extent the parties have different views on this matter, they may supplement the joint filing with letter submissions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/21/2019) (kv) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-2843JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated 10/28/19 re: Court Order to Show Cause from 10/21. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc..(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2844LETTER MOTION to Seal Document 43 Letter addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated 10/28/19. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc..(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-3145ORDER granting in part 44 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document 43 Letter. Plaintiffs sealing requests, Dkt. No. 44, are granted, with the exception of Exhibit D. That exhibit consists solely of the bylaws of the American Academy of Forensic Science. The Court sees no reason why this document should be filed under seal. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/31/2019) (jca) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-0546NOTICE of Filing Unsealed Exhibit D to Declaration of M. Chris Fabricant re: 45 Order on Motion to Seal Document,. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-12-0447ORDER re: 45 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Pursuant to the Court's Order of October 31, 2019, Dkt. No. 45, Plaintiff was to serve all relevant documents from this proceeding on both the author and the subject of the document in question, and file proof of service with the Court. As of the date of this Order, the Court is not receipt of proof of service on these individuals. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to file proof of service with the Court within one week of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/3/2019) (kv) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-1048LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proofs of Service addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated 12/10/2019. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc..(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-1249ORDER granting 48 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/11/2019) (va) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
2019-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Service due by 12/20/2019. (va) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-2150LETTER MOTION to Seal Document 49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, 47 Order,, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated Dec. 21, 2019., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File and to Excuse Late Filing addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated Dec. 21, 2019. Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc..(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2019)
2019-12-2351ORDER granting 50 Motion to Seal Document 50 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document 49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, 47 Order,, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated Dec. 21, 2019. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File and to Excuse Late Filing addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated Dec. 21, 2019. ; granting 50 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court previously ordered Plaintiff to give notice to the author and subject of a particular document, which may be subject to the Privacy Act, that Plaintiff seeks unrestricted disclosure of the document. Dkt. No. 45. On December 20, 2019, the Court received a letter from the author of the document, asking for an extension of time to obtain counsel and oppose unrestricted disclosure of the document. The Court hereby extends the author's time to file briefing opposing disclosure of the document to January 31, 2020. The Court further orders that the letter it received be filed under seal. Chambers will mail a copy of this Order to the author of the document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/23/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kv) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-2352MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 50 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document 49 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, 47 Order,, addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated Dec. 21, 2019. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File and to Excuse Late Filing addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jonathan Manes dated Dec. 21, 2019. filed by The Innocence Project, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/23/2019) (kv) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2020-01-1753STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Document filed by The Innocence Project, Inc..(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-2154NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan Matthew Manes on behalf of The Innocence Project, Inc.. New Address: MacArthur Justice Center, 160 E Grand Ave, 6th Floor, Chicago, IL, USA 60611, (312) 503-0012. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-2255MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 53 Status Report filed by The Innocence Project, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/21/2020) (kv) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar