Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCARING HANDS HEALTH EQUIPMENT & SUPPLIES, LLC v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00441
Date Filed2019-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCARING HANDS HEALTH EQUIPMENT & SUPPLIES, LLC
Case DescriptionCaring Hands Health Equipment & Supplies submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning procurements of durable medical equipment services by the VA Veterans Integrated Services Network - Southeast Network 7 from January 2015 to the present. After hearing nothing from the agency, Caring Hands filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal and told Caring Hands that the agency could not yet provide an estimated completion date. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Caring Hands filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5959395) filed by Caring Hands Health Equipment & Supplies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Tolchin, Edward) (Attachment 7 replaced on 2/22/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-22Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-222SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to US ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Modified on 2/26/2019 to the party name that is reflected on the summons docketed (zef, ). (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-223ERRATA to the Docket by CARING HANDS HEALTH EQUIPMENT & SUPPLIES, LLC 1 Complaint, filed by CARING HANDS HEALTH EQUIPMENT & SUPPLIES, LLC. (Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-224LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CARING HANDS HEALTH EQUIPMENT & SUPPLIES, LLC (Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-225REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by CARING HANDS HEALTH EQUIPMENT & SUPPLIES, LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CARING HANDS HEALTH EQUIPMENT & SUPPLIES, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-266SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS., SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-067NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-138RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 3/1/2019 (Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-139RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/1/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/31/2019. (Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-1310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/01/2019. (Tolchin, Edward) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar