Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLegal Aid Justice Center v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2019cv00201
Date Filed2019-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge T. S. Ellis, III
PlaintiffLegal Aid Justice Center
DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-211Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6503000.), filed by Legal Aid Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Ryan, Hallie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-212Proposed Summons by Legal Aid Justice Center. (Ryan, Hallie) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/21/2019) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Notice of Correction re 2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that the proposed summons 2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-213Proposed Summons (proper file format) by Legal Aid Justice Center. (Ryan, Hallie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-224Summons Issued as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-125NOTICE by Legal Aid Justice Center Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavits of Process Server)(Ryan, Hallie) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar