Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv00541
Date Filed2019-02-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management. The first request asked for records concerning the sale of 20 or more wild horses in one transaction on multiple occasions since 2015. The second FOIA request asked for records concerning wild horses that were removed from the Little Book Cliffs Herd Management Area and were adopted and sold in 2018. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-251COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6549858)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit A-C)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-252Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-253SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-254MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00541-NRN. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-255Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-266ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/26/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 4/18/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/2/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-127NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of United States Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar