Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCA Planned Parenthood Education Fund v. U.S. Dept of HHS
DistrictEastern District of California
CitySacramento
Case Number2:2019cv00340
Date Filed2019-02-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Troy L. Nunley
PlaintiffCalifornia Planned Parenthood Education Fund
Case DescriptionThe California Planned Parenthood Education Fund submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning proposed changes to the Title X family planning program. HHS acknowledged receipt of the request and asked the Fund to clarify its request. The Fund did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Fund filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Opinion/Order [14]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-261COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services by California Planned Parenthood Education Fund. Attorney Kelley, Mary Kathryn added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8129103) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit (A) Freedom of Information Act Request - August 1, 2018, # 3 Exhibit (B) HHS Response - August 1, 2018, # 4 Exhibit (C) HHS Response - August 1, 2018, # 5 Exhibit (D) HHS Letter - September 24, 2018, # 6 Exhibit (E) CPPEF Response - September 28, 2018, # 7 Exhibit (F) CPPEF FOIA Status Request - November 2018, # 8 Exhibit (G) CPPEF FOIA Status Request - January 2019, # 9 Exhibit (H) HHSs FOIA's Website)(Kelley, Mary) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-262[DISREGARD - SEE 5 SUMMONS] SUMMONS ISSUED as to *U.S. Department of Health and Human Services* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Mary Kathryn Kelley* *Cooley LLP* *4401 Eastgate Mall* *San Diego, CA 92121*. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 3/6/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-263CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-274CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff California Planned Parenthood Education Fund. (Kelley, Mary) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-055SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to *U.S. Department of Health and Human Services* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Mary Kathryn Kelley* *Cooley LLP* *4401 Eastgate Mall* *San Diego, CA 92121*. (York, M) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-066SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by California Planned Parenthood Education Fund. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 3/6/2019. (Kelley, Mary) Modified on 3/6/2019 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-067CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by California Planned Parenthood Education Fund re 3 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Kelley, Mary) Modified on 3/7/2019 (Huang, H). (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-04-058ANSWER by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Attorney Olsen, Edward A. added.(Olsen, Edward) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-06-139PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by California Planned Parenthood Education Fund for attorney Rachel Thorn to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8311184) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing - Rachel Thorn)(Kelley, Mary) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1310PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by California Planned Parenthood Education Fund for attorney Caroline Pignatelli to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8311210) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing - Caroline Pignatelli)(Kelley, Mary) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1711PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/14/19. Added attorney Caroline Pignatelli, PHV for California Planned Parenthood Education Fund. (Coll, A) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-1712PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/14/19. Added attorney Rachel Thorn, PHV for California Planned Parenthood Education Fund. (Coll, A) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-12-2013NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-01848-KJM-KJN by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Olsen, Edward) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-01-1314RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/08/20 RELATING cases 2:19-cv-0340 TLN CKD and 2:19-cv-1848 KJM KJN. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar