Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePeople of the State of New York v. United States Department of Labor
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv01976
Date Filed2019-03-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vernon S. Broderick
PlaintiffPeople of the State of New York by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York
Case DescriptionThe State of New York submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning participation in the Payroll Audit Independent Determination program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told New York that it was processing the request. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, New York filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAll Defendants
United States Department of Labor
DefendantUnited States Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-011FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against United States Department of Labor. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16430575)Document filed by New York State Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - WHD Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - OASP Response, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - OASCIA Response, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E - WHD Communication)(Lynch, Kevin) Modified on 3/4/2019 (pne). (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-012CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lynch, Kevin) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-013FILING ERROR - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-07029. Document filed by New York State Attorney General.(Lynch, Kevin) Modified on 3/4/2019 (pne). (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-014FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Labor, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York State Attorney General. (Lynch, Kevin) Modified on 3/4/2019 (pne). (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-04CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04CASE REFERRED TO Judge P. Kevin Castel as possibly related to 18CV7029. (pne) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin M. Lynch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: People of the State of New York, United States Department of Labor. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (pne) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kevin M. Lynch to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; the name of the filer is incorrect on the docket entry. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Kevin M. Lynch to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the related case statement; the name of the filer is incorrect on the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (pne) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kevin M. Lynch to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; the name of the filer is incorrect on the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-045COMPLAINT against United States Department of Labor. Document filed by People of the State of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - WHD Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - OASP Response, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - OASCIA Response, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E - WHD Letter)(Lynch, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-046STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-cv-07029. Document filed by People of the State of New York.(Lynch, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-047REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Labor, re: 5 Complaint,. Document filed by People of the State of New York. (Lynch, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-058ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Labor. (dnh) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-069Objection re: 6 Statement of Relatedness . Document filed by United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Prior FOIA request), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Instant FOIA request))(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 18CV7029 and declined by Judge P. Kevin Castel and returned to wheel for assignment. (ma) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (ma) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar