Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00609
Date Filed2019-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffADAM ENTOUS
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and New Yorker reporter Adam Entous submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the Department of State, the Department of Justice, the Department of Defense, the Department of Commerce, and the U.S. Agency for International Development for records concerning attacks on U.S. personnel in Cuba and China specifically, and, more broadly, attacks on U.S. personnel anywhere in the world with particular emphasis on Russia. JMP and Entous also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request and DOJ denied JMP and Entous's request for expedited processing. However, after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, JMP and Entous filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-051COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5981678) filed by ADAM ENTOUS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons CIA, # 4 Summons DOJ, # 5 Summons Commerce, # 6 Summons State, # 7 Summons DoD, # 8 Summons USADC, # 9 Summons USAG, # 10 Summons USAID)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-05Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-053SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-054STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 5, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 3/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-138RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-139RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/11/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-1310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/11/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit proof of service)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-04-0511NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0512MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and DIRECTING the defendants to respond by May 10, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 9, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/10/2019. (tg) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-2313NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Zaid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-05-1014ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-1415MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by ADAM ENTOUS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-06-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiffs' 15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, which the government does not oppose. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 3, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-0316AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT filed by ADAM ENTOUS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT.(zrdj) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-09-05MINUTE ORDER (paperless) TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. The amended complaint was docketed in June 2019 but no answer or response has been timely filed. Accordingly, the plaintiff is ORDERED to submit, by September 12, 2019, (1) a full explanation of why counsel for the parties have not jointly prepared and submitted a Meet and Confer Report to the Court, as required by the 4 Standing Order and (2) a full explanation of why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If it is determined that the plaintiff has not shown good cause for failure to prosecute, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 5, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 9/12/2019. (tg) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-1117RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ADAM ENTOUS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT re Order,,, . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the plaintiffs' 17 Response to Order to Show Cause stating that the parties have been engaged in substantive discussions, that the parties file, by September 26, 2019, a Joint Status Report providing the information required by the 4 Standing Order; and further DIRECTING the government to file, by September 26, 2019, an explanation of the legal basis for its position that no answer or other response to the 16 First Amended Complaint need be filed. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 11, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/26/2019. Government's explanation due by 9/26/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-2118Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/21/2019)
2019-09-24MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and DIRECTING the parties to file, by October 10, 2019, a Joint Status Report providing the information required by the 4 Standing Order; and further DIRECTING the government to file, by October 10, 2019, an explanation of the legal basis for its position that no answer or other response to the 16 First Amended Complaint need be filed. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 24, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2019; government's response to Order of the Court due by 10/10/2019. (tg) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-2419MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT (Attachments: # 1 Answer to Amended Complaint)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-30MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 19 Motion for Leave to File Answer out of Time and ACCEPTING for filing as of today, September 30, 2019, the Answer to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 30, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-09-3020ANSWER to 16 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT.(zrdj) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-1021Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by November 25, 2019, a further joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 17, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/25/2019. (ztg) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-11-0223STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) Modified date filed due to cmecf issues on 11/25/19 on 11/26/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-2122NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Jason Cohen (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-26MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the defendants' 23 Status Report, that the parties file, by January 24, 2020, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 26, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2020-01-2424Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the 24 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by March 24, 2020, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 27, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 3/24/2020. (tg) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-03-2425Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the 25 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by May 26, 2020, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 25, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/26/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
2020-05-2626Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the 26 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by July 27, 2020, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 29, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2020. (tg) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-07-2727Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by September 25, 2020, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 28, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-09-2528Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by November 24, 2020, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 28, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/24/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-11-2429Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 29 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by January 25, 2021, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 24, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-11-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2021-01-2530Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-01-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by February 24, 2021, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 27, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-02-2431Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 31 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by March 26, 2021, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 25, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-03-2632Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-03-30MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 32 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by April 23, 2021, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 30, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
2021-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
2021-04-0633NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Sean Tepe (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-2334Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/23/2021)
2021-04-26MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 34 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by June 22, 2021, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 26, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/26/2021)
2021-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 04/27/2021)
2021-06-2235Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties 35 Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to File Status Report and DIRECTING the parties to file, by June 29, 2021, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 22, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/23/2021)
2021-06-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 06/23/2021)
2021-06-2936Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-07-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 36 Joint Status Report and DIRECTING the parties to file, by August 30, 2021, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 30, 2021. (lcbah2). Modified on 7/1/2021 (lcbah2). (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-08-3037Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 37 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by October 14, 2021, a joint status report indicating whether any issues remain and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 16, 2021. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar