Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDavis Wright Tremaine LLP v. United States Customs and Border Protection
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv00334
Date Filed2019-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S. Martinez
PlaintiffDavis Wright Tremaine LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Davis Wright Tremaine submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning its policy of banning Canadians involved in the cannabis industry from entering the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [13]
Opinion/Order [17]
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-061COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Customs and Border Protection (Receipt # 0981-5678165) Attorney Christopher C. Morley added to party Davis Wright Tremaine LLP(pty:pla), filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Morley, Christopher) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-07Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-072Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Customs and Border Protection (GT) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-07NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/14/2019. (GT) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-073NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-074CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Morley, Christopher) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-135CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (Morley, Christopher) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-226ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/26/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-227NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection. (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-118Stipulated MOTION for Relief of 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report , filed by Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection. Noting Date 4/11/2019, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-159ORDER granting parties' 8 Stipulated Motion for Relief of 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 5/27/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LW) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-05-2810JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. (McKay, John) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-3111STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 10 Joint Status Report and Stipulation. Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-2812JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-0113STIPULATION AND ORDER re: parties' 12 Joint Status Report and Stipulation. Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-2614Joint STATUS REPORT and Stipulation by Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-2615STIPULATION AND ORDER re: parties' 14 Joint Status Report and Stipulation. Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-09-2716STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-0117JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 16 Stipulation. The parties intend to continue discussions regarding what issues may remain in this case. The parties propose to file an update with the Court on or before October 28, 2019 that, if necessary, will include a proposed deadline for CBP's responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-2818JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2819ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Customs and Border Protection.(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-0120NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jordan C Harris on behalf of Plaintiff Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. (Harris, Jordan) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-0121JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 Joint Status Report. The parties intend to continue discussions regarding what issues may remain in this case. The parties propose to file a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule within 90 days of this Court's order if they are not able to otherwise resolve this matter. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2020-01-3022Joint Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection. Noting Date 1/30/2020, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-02-0323STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 22 Stipulated Motion. By February 6, 2020, Plaintiff will file a motion for summary judgment to be noted for consideration on March 20, 2010. By March 6, 2020, Defendant will file a joint response to Plaintiffs motion and cross-motion for summary judgment. By March 13, 2020, Plaintiff will file a joint reply in support of its motion and oppositionto Defendant's cross-motion. By March 20, 2020, Defendant will file a reply in support of its cross-motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-0324MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2020, (Morley, Christopher) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-0325DECLARATION of Christopher C Morley filed by Plaintiff Davis Wright Tremaine LLP re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Exhibit 6-10, # 3 Exhibit 11-15, # 4 Exhibit 16-20, # 5 Exhibit 21-25, # 6 Exhibit 26-30, # 7 Exhibit 31-35, # 8 Exhibit 36-40)(Morley, Christopher) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-03-0526Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection. Noting Date 3/5/2020, (Boerger, Tricia) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-0627STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' 26 Stipulated Motion re briefing schedule for Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Summary Judgment: By 3/13/2020, Defendant will file a joint opposition to Plaintiff's motion and cross-motion for summary judgment of no more than 24 pages; By 3/27/2020, Plaintiff will file a joint reply in support of its motion and opposition to Defendant's cross-motion of no more than 12 pages; By 4/6/2020, Defendant will file a reply in support of its cross-motion of no more than 12 pages. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-1328CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., filed by Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection. Noting Date 4/6/2020, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1329DECLARATION of Patrick Howard filed by Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection re 28 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1630PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 28 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Granting Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-1631PRAECIPE to attach document (Propose Order) re 28 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . by Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-2732REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, TO RESPONSE to 28 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McKay, John) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar