Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00633
Date Filed2019-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning Katherine Gorka, who worked at the agency as an adviser and played a role in terminating the agency's domestic terrorism investigation unit. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and conditionally granted DFF's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5986773) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-07Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-073LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/11/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/11/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/8/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar