Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC et al v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00666
Date Filed2019-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffNOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC
formerly known as EYE MACHINE, LLC
PlaintiffPETER POCKLINGTON
PlaintiffLANTSON E. ELDRED
PlaintiffAMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC
Case DescriptionNova Oculus Partners submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning Nova Oculus Partners. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked Nova Oculus Partners to clarify and modify its request, which it did. The agency then denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Nova Oculus Partners filed an administrative appeal, which was denied by the agency. Nova Oculus Partners then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Opinion/Order [20]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5991383) filed by NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, f/k/a THE EYE MACHINE, LLC, AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit)(Himes, Lisa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/11/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-11Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-153RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/14/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/13/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/14/2019. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 3/14/2019 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-04-126NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Hardy on behalf of UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Hardy, Melinda) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-127ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Hardy, Melinda) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-15MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 15, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-268NOTICE of Appearance by Carin Marie Cozza on behalf of All Defendants (Cozza, Carin) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-269Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Order by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-29MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the SEC shall produce all non-exempt, responsive documents in rolling productions on or before May 29, 2019, July 1, 2019, and July 31, 2019. The productions shall follow the order of production set forth in the parties joint report. On or before August 15, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report that proposes a schedule for further proceedings, including a summary judgment briefing, if necessary. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 29, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2019. (mac) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-0810LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMC Holdings Co., LLC and by NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-07-2411Joint STATUS REPORT by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-25MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the Court adopts the parties' jointly proposed briefing schedule. The defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before September 13, 2019; the plaintiff shall file its opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 4, 2019; the defendant shall file any reply and cross-opposition on or before October 25, 2019; and the plaintiff shall file any reply on or before November 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 25, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 9/13/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion due by 10/4/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motion due by 10/25/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/6/2019. (kh) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-09-1312MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Cozza, Carin) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-09-1313MEMORANDUM re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Carin Cozza, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration-Vaughn Index, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration-Formal Order)(Cozza, Carin) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-10-0414Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Becky James, # 2 Declaration of Walter O'Rourke, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-0415Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. (See Docket Entry 14 to view documents) (jf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-2516REPLY to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Counter Statement of Facts)(Hardy, Melinda) Modified text on 10/28/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-2517Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (See Docket Entry 16 to view document) (ztth) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-0618REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMC HOLDINGS CO., LLC, LANTSON E. ELDRED, NOVA OCULUS PARTNERS, LLC, PETER POCKLINGTON. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2020-08-2819ORDER granting the defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying the plaintiffs' 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. See text for details. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-2820MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment and the plaintiffs' 14 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar