Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReynolds v. United States of America et al
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CityJefferson City
Case Number2:2019cv04049
Date Filed2019-03-08
Date Closed2019-04-12
JudgeDistrict Judge Brian C. Wimes
PlaintiffMark Paul Reynolds
DefendantUnited States of America
DefendantState of Missouri
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-081MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Paul Reynolds. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Waiver of Service of Summons-Exhibit 4, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-082MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Mark Paul Reynolds. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-083ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey no longer assigned to case. Case number shall now ready 2:19-cv-4049-BCW. Copy mailed to plaintiff. Signed on 03/08/2019 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-04-124ORDERED Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #1) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #2) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order by U.S. Mail to: Mark Paul Reynolds, 9560 State Road O, Steedman, MO 65077-1310. Signed on 4/12/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella) Modified on 4/12/2019 copy of order mailed via regular mail to Mark Paul Reynolds, 9560 State Road O, Steedman, MO 65077-1310. (Kern, Kendra) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar