Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Children's Advocacy Institute v. Office of Refugee Resettlement, Administration for Children and Families et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2019cv00462
Date Filed2019-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Gonzalo P. Curiel
PlaintiffThe Children's Advocacy Institute
Case DescriptionThe Children's Advocacy Institute submitted FOIA requests to the Office of Refugee Resettlement at the Administration for Children and Families and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the number of adults detained for immigration-related offenses, including whether they were accompanied by minor children, for each month beginning in January 2018. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement told the Institute that because its request did not identify individuals it could not search for the data. The Institute filed an administrative appeal of that decision. U.S. Customs and Border Protection asked the Institute to clarify its request. The Institute did so. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the Children's Advocacy Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantOffice of Refugee Resettlement, Administration for Children and Families United States Department of Health and Human Services
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement United States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection United States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [17]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-111COMPLAINT against Office of Refugee Resettlement, Administration for Children and Families, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12286779), filed by The Children's Advocacy Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:19-cv-00462-GPC-BGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Anderson, Travis)(cdw) (jao). (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-112Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-273SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Children's Advocacy Institute. All Defendants served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Proof of Service by Certified Mail - Return Receipt Requested)(Anderson, Travis) (dlg). (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-224ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Office of Refugee Resettlement, Administration for Children and Families, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Office of Refugee Resettlement, Administration for Children and Families(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party United States Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-305NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation of your case will be held on July 29, 2019, at 1:30 PM before United States Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 4/30/19.(dlg) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-096MOTION to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conferences (Unopposed) by Office of Refugee Resettlement, Administration for Children and Families, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Church, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-167ORDER Granting Joint 6 Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation of your case will be held on August 26, 2019, at 1:30 PM before United States Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/16/19. (dlg) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-07-178Joint MOTION to Vacate 7 Order on Motion to Continue, to Vacate Case Management Conference and Related Discovery Dates Without Prejudice by Office of Refugee Resettlement, Administration for Children and Families, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Church, Rebecca) (dlg). (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-179ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion to Vacate Case Management Conference and Related Dates Without Prejudice. The Case Management portion2 of the August 26, 2019 conference and dates listed above are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/17/2019. (jrm) (jao). (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-08-2310MINUTE ORDER: The Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 1:30 p.m. is CONVERTED to an attorneys-only telephonic conference. Accordingly, counsel for the parties shall jointly call (619) 557-2993 at 1:30 p.m. on 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/23/2019.(no document attached) (rxa) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-2611Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 8/26/2019. The parties will continue to meet and confer to determine what documents are responsive to Plaintiff's request and both parties indicate that documents are being produced on a rolling basis and this will continue. Telephonic attorneys-only Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel shall jointly call (619) 557-2993 for the conference.(Plaintiff Attorney Travis Anderson, Trevor Mann-OHalloran, Robert Sellmeth, Jessica Heldman). (Defendant Attorney Rebecca Church). (no document attached) (rxa) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-10-1712Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Case Management Conference held on 10/17/2019. Parties have made substantial progress and are working together on document production. Parties request 60 days for a status conference. Telephonic attorneys-only Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel shall jointly call (619) 557-2993 for the conference.(Plaintiff Attorney Travis Anderson). (Defendant Attorney Rebecca Church). (no document attached) (rxa) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-12-0913MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the telephonic attorneys-only Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM is CONTINUED to 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall jointly call (619) 557-2993 for the conference.(no document attached) (rxa) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-1914Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Status Conference held on 12/19/2019. Production of documents is continuing. Parties request a status conference in 45 days. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel shall jointly call (619) 557-2993 for the status conference.(Plaintiff Attorney Travis Anderson, Trevor Mann-OHalloran). (Defendant Attorney Rebecca Church). (no document attached) (rxa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2020-02-0515Minute Entry for proceedings held with Chambers of Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Status Conference held on 2/5/2020. Parties provided an update on the status of productions. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. For the 4/7/2020 Status Conference the parties must provide the Court with a date by which all productions will be complete.(Plaintiff Attorney Travis Anderson, Trevor Mann-OHalloran, Robert Sellmeth). (Defendant Attorney Rebecca Church). (no document attached) (rxa) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-1816Joint MOTION Order on Stipulation by United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Church, Rebecca) (dlg). (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-03-0217ORDER Accepting Joint 16 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/2/20. (dlg) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-04-0118ORDER for Status Report. The Status Report must be filed no later than April 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/31/20.(dlg) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-0319STATUS REPORT by Office of Refugee Resettlement, Administration for Children and Families, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Church, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-0320MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Status Report (ECF 19), the Court CONTINUES the telephonic Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 to 4/21/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Parties shall coordinate joint call to (619) 557-2993 for the Status Conference.(no document attached) (rxa) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar