Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5992572) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons to the Attorney General, # 6 Summons to the State Dept, # 7 Summons to the US Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | | Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 4 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 11, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-04-19 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/19/2019) |
2019-04-24 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/24/2019) |
2019-05-08 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-08 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of the 7 Joint Status Report, to file, by June 12, 2019, a joint status report regarding the defendant's response to the plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 8, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-05-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2019. (tg) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-06-12 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/12/2019) |
2019-06-12 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by July 10, 2019, a joint status report proposing a schedule to control further proceedings in this matter, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 12, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/12/2019) |
2019-06-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2019, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. (tg) (Entered: 06/12/2019) |
2019-07-05 | 9 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by CITIZENS UNITED. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 07/05/2019) |
2019-07-08 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice, by which the parties have agreed to dismiss this case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 8, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/08/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |