Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against IMMIGRATION & CUSTOM'S ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5992747) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 2 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 3 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/11/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 4 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 03/11/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 5 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-04-02 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/12/2019. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-04-02 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/13/2019. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-04-02 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/13/2019 (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-04-12 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
2019-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/12/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
2019-04-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-05-15 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of 10 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before May 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/16/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-05-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ordered to file a further Joint Status Report on or before July 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/31/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-05-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-06-24 | 12 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Fred Haynes (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-07-08 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 07/08/2019) |
2019-07-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 13 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ordered to file a further Joint Status Report on or before July 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/8/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/08/2019) |
2019-07-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/09/2019) |
2019-07-12 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-07-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 14 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before September 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/15/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/15/2019) |
2019-07-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 07/16/2019) |
2019-09-11 | 15 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sabarish P. Neelakanta on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Neelakanta, Sabarish) (Main Document 15 replaced to correct case number on 9/13/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-09-11 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Neelakanta, Sabarish) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-09-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report on or before January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/11/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-09-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2020. (tg) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-09-17 | 17 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. Attorney Deborah Maxine Golden terminated. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-09-26 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Maxine Golden on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 09/26/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 19 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lucas Marshall on behalf of HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Marshall, Daniel) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2020-01-10 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 01/10/2020) |
2020-01-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before February 10, 2020, addressing the status of settlement negotiations. If the parties reach a settlement before February 10, 2020, they shall promptly inform the Court. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/13/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/13/2020) |
2020-01-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 01/13/2020) |
2020-02-10 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/10/2020) |
2020-02-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report on or before March 11, 2020, advising the Court of a proposed schedule for further proceedings in this matter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/10/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/10/2020) |
2020-02-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 02/11/2020) |
2020-03-11 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/11/2020) |
2020-03-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report on or before April 10, 2020, advising the Court of a proposed schedule for further proceedings in this matter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/12/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
2020-03-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 03/12/2020) |
2020-04-10 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 04/10/2020) |
2020-04-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file, on or before April 17, 2020, a joint stipulation of dismissal or an additional joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter, including a recommendation for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/10/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/10/2020) |
2020-04-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint stipulation of dismissal or additional joint status report due by 4/17/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 04/13/2020) |
2020-04-17 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 04/17/2020) |
2020-04-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file, on or before May 1, 2020, a joint stipulation of dismissal or an additional joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter, including a recommendation for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/20/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/20/2020) |
2020-04-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint stipulation of dismissal or joint status report due by 5/1/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 04/20/2020) |
2020-04-28 | 25 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 04/28/2020) |
2020-04-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Stipulation of Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice according to the terms of the stipulation. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/28/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/28/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |