Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00686
Date Filed2019-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Interior and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning revised guidance for processing FOIA requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-121COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5995258) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of Interior, # 3 Summons Fish and Wildlife Service, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-123SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/15/2019; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 3/15/2019 (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/18/2019. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/19/2019. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-127MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. In order to permit defense counsel additional time to confer with agency counsel and prepare a response, and without any objection expressed by Plaintiff, the Court GRANTS' Defendants' 7 Motion, for good cause shown. The deadline for Defendants' answer or other response to the 1 Complaint shall be extended until MAY 10, 2019 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 15, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/10/2019. (dot) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-05-108ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-159ORDER. The parties shall file the schedule not later than JUNE 14, 2019 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 15, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2019. (kt) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-06-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendants' processing and production of Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act requests are in progress. The Court shall adopt the parties' proposal that they file a further Joint Status Report by JULY 16, 2019 . That report shall update the Court as to the status of Defendants' processing, production, and estimated timeline for issuance of draft Vaughn indices. The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report every thirty days thereafter, unless and until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 14, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2019. (dot) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-24Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-1611Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-08-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 12 Joint Status Report, and consistent with the Court's June 14, 2019 Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties submit an additional Joint Status Report by September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 15, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Additional Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-09-1013NOTICE of Appearance by Amy R. Atwood on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-1614Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-10-1615Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by November 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 16, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/15/2019 (mac) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-11-1516Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 11/15/2019)
2019-11-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 19, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2019. (mac) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-12-1617Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)
2019-12-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by January 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 17, 2019. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2020-01-2318Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by February 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 23, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/24/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/26/2020)
2020-02-2419Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-24MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 24, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-24Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-2520Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 26, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
2020-04-2421Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 27, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-2622Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by June 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 27, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar