Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00689
Date Filed2019-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the creation and modification of CBP's "Biometric Exit Frequently Asked Questions" webpage. EPIC also requested inclusion in the news media fee category and expedited processing. EPIC was able to confirm that the request was delivered through the Postal Service, but did not receive an acknowledgment from the agency. After EPIC called the agency to inquire about the status of the request, CBP told EPIC that it could not locate the request and that its FOIA processing was backlogged because of the government shutdown. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-121COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5995533) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Customs and Border Protection, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Scott, Jeramie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/12/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-293RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2019. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/25/2019. (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 3/25/2019 (Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar