Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00697
Date Filed2019-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of the Navy for records concerning testing for contaminants at several Navy and Marine bases in California. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-121COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5996951) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration corporate disclosure, # 3 Summons Navy Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons, # 5 Summons USAODC Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/13/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-13Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-04-014NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-185ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-186VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 8 ENTERED ON 5/20/2019.....ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn index and supporting dispositive motion within thirty days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/18/2019. (lcrcl3) Modified on 5/21/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index and supporting Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-05-037MOTION to Vacate Dispositive Motion Deadline by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-218ORDER granting 7 Motion to Vacate. The government shall respond to plaintiff's FOIA request and the parties shall file a joint status report every 45 days until production is complete. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/20/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-07-059Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-08-06MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further joint status report no later than 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/06/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-16MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further joint status report no later than 9/30/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/16/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar