Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2019cv01343
Date Filed2019-03-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffLawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area A California non-profit corporation
PlaintiffCentral American Resource Center A California non-profit corporation
PlaintiffCenter for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law A California non-profit corporation
PlaintiffDolores Street Community Services A California non-profit corporation
PlaintiffJustice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco A California non-profit corporation
PlaintiffLa Raza Community Resource Center A California non-profit corporation
PlaintiffLegal Services for Children A California non-profit corporation
PlaintiffPangea Legal Services A California non-profit corporation
PlaintiffUniversity of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic A clinic within the non-proft university
Case DescriptionThe Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area and a number of other Bay area social justice organizations submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services - one to the national office and one to the San Francisco office - for records concerning the use of gang indicators to assess whether asylum applicants are gang members. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, closed the FOIA request submitted to the agency's San Francisco office as a duplicate, and invoked a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Lawyers Committee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13168717.). Filed byLa Raza Community Resource Center, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law, Legal Services for Children, Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic at the University of San Francisco School of Law, Central American Resource Center, Pangea Legal Services, Dolores Street Community Services, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to FOIA Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to FOIA Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to FOIA Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to FOIA Complaint, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/13/2019) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-132Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/13/2019) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-133Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-144Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-145Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-146MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Robert E. Miller ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13172829.) filed by University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law, Central American Resource Center, Dolores Street Community Services, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, La Raza Community Resource Center, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Legal Services for Children, Pangea Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-147ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 6 Robert E. Miller's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-288CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/11/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-299CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law, Central American Resource Center, Dolores Street Community Services, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, La Raza Community Resource Center, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Legal Services for Children, Pangea Legal Services.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-0210CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 4/2/2019) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-1211ANSWER to Complaint 1 by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 4/12/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-05-2912ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Miller, Robert) (Filed on 5/29/2019) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-06-0413ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendants (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-1214JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic,Robert Edward Miller for Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law, Robert Edward Miller for Central American Resource Center, Robert Edward Miller for Dolores Street Community Services, Robert Edward Miller for Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, Robert Edward Miller for La Raza Community Resource Center, Robert Edward Miller for Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Robert Edward Miller for Legal Services for Children, Robert Edward Miller for Pangea Legal Services added. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-1915PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/19/2019 2:00:58 PM ]. File Size [ 7560 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:15:45 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-1916Corporate Disclosure Statement by University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law, Central American Resource Center, Dolores Street Community Services, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, La Raza Community Resource Center, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Legal Services for Children, Pangea Legal Services (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-1917Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/19/2019. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM. See minute Order for more particulars. FTR Time: 2:00-2:16. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-08-1418JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law, Central American Resource Center, Dolores Street Community Services, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, La Raza Community Resource Center, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Legal Services for Children, Pangea Legal Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Miller, Robert) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-2119PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/21/2019 1:39:43 PM ]. File Size [ 9392 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:19:34 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-2120Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/21/2019. See minute Order for all particulars. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. FTR Time: 1:39-1:59. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-09-1821RESPONSE DECLARATION OF JILL A. EGGLESTON IN RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER OF AUGUST 21, 2019 re 20 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Case Management Conference - Further,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 9/18/2019) Modified on 9/19/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-1922NOTICE of Appearance by Kirstin M. Ault (Ault, Kirstin) (Filed on 9/19/2019) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-10-0923JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law, Central American Resource Center, Dolores Street Community Services, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, La Raza Community Resource Center, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Legal Services for Children, Pangea Legal Services, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Miller, Robert) (Filed on 10/9/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-1624PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/16/2019 2:37:28 PM ]. File Size [ 15496 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:32:17 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-1625Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/16/2019. By 10/30/2019, parties shall submit a Stipulation and proposed Order re: meet and confer schedule and briefing schedule for Rule 56 motion(s) regarding withholdings/redactions in the training materials. See minute Order for more particulars. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2020 01:30 PM. FTR Time: 2:37-3:09. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/16/2019) (Entered: 10/18/2019)
2019-10-3026STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Dates filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and All Plaintiffs. (Ault, Kirstin) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 10/31/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-11-1227Order [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 26 Scheduling Stipulation. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-2128NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CO-COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-2229Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone conference held on 11/22/2019. The parties have agreed and the Court orders that the following dates shall be set in the mediation in this matter: Agreement on categories of redactions at issue by 12/6/2019; Agreement on sample redactions by 12/13/2019; and Submission of mediation briefs to the Court by 1/17/2020. A mediation with the Court will be held on 1/21/2020 at 9:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Not Reported)(Time 00:15) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Robert Miller; Thomas Burke. Attorney for Defendants: Kirstin Ault. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-2730NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)
2019-12-0431STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dates for Status Report and Hearing on Motions Civ. L.R. 7-12 filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Dolores Street Community Services, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, Legal Services for Children, La Raza Community Resource Center, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law, Central American Resource Center, Pangea Legal Services, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area and University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic.. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 12/4/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-0532Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 31 Stipulation AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2020. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-0533CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the CMC currently set for January 29, 2020 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) , Set/Reset Deadlines as to (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2020-01-1534ORDER re: personal appearances at the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/15/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-2135Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: In person settlement conference held on January 21, 2020. Further facilitated discussions will occur on Wednesday, February 19, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. with counsel and clients, as desired. The parties should use the Court's conference call-in number. (Not Reported)(Time 3:30) Attorney for Plaintiffs: Robert Miller. Attorney for Defendants: Gioconda Molinari. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-0436STATUS REPORT RE: MEDIATION by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-04Electronic filing error . Document filed in wrong case. [err401] The case number on the caption of the document is 19-cv-0343 and the footer has 18-cv-2711 DMR. Please correct the case numbers and re-file in its entirety. Re: 36 Status Report filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-0537STATUS REPORT by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-0738ORDER: The court has reviewed the parties' status report 37 . The parties shall file a further status report by March 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on February 7, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-1939Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Further telephone settlement conference held. The Court will hold a further settlement call with the parties on 2/26/2020 at 4:00 p.m. The parties shall use the Courts conference call number. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Plaintiff Attorneys: Robert Miller and Thomas Burke. Defendant Attorneys: Gioconda Molinari and Amber Duggan. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-03-1340Joint Status Report re: Mediation by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hasting Collage of the Law, Central American Resource Center, Dolores Street Community Service, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, La Raza Community Resource Center, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Legal Services for Children, Pangea Legal Services, University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 3/13/2020) Modified on 3/16/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1941ORDER: The court has received the parties' status report 40 . The parties shall file an updated status report by July 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/19/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-04-2142STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Mediation Briefing Schedule filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hasting Collage of the Law, Central American Resource Center, Dolores Street Community Service, Justice & Diversity Center of the Bar Association of San Francisco, La Raza Community Resource Center, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Legal Services for Children, Pangea Legal Services, University of San Francisco School of Law Immigration and Deportation Defense Clinic. . (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 4/21/2020) Modified on 4/22/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-2243ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 42 Stipulation Re: Mediation Briefing Schedule. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar