Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00726
Date Filed2019-03-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications involving the FBI Director, the Deputy Director and the Office of General Counsel pertaining to possible Russian interference in the 2016 presidential campaign. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Judicial Watch that all responsive records fell under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy, which upheld the FBI's denial. Judicial Watch then submitted a second FOIA request to the Justice Department for records concerning communications involving the Attorney General and Deputy Attorney General pertaining to the investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 presidential campaign. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6003140) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-15Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-224STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/22/19. (Attachment: # Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/22/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-226ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Powers, James) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-05-02MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than May 24, 2019. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/2/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/24/2019. (mac) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-147NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Payne Lee on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-248Joint STATUS REPORT re Minute Order dated May 2, 2019 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Powers, James) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-29MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report informing the Court of the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests and proposing a joint recommendation for further proceedings by no later than August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/29/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Recommendation For Further Proceedings due by 8/23/2019. (mac) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar