Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHITCH v. CISSNA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00736
Date Filed2019-03-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCATHERINE HITCH
Case DescriptionCatherine Hitch, a former employee of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, submitted a FOIA request to the agency for records concerning a contract with Pitney Bowes for equipment and services to agency offices. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Hitch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantL. FRANCIS CISSNA
DefendantL. FRANCIS CISSNA Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, in his official capacity as well as his successors and assigns
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-151COMPLAINT against L. FRANCIS CISSNA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6003862) filed by CATHERINE HITCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Defendant Agency, # 3 Summons for US Attorney DC, # 4 Summons US Attorney General)(Estes, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-18Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-04-043STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 4, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-05-084NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of L. FRANCIS CISSNA (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-085ANSWER to Complaint by L. FRANCIS CISSNA.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-226Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by June 28, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 23, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019. (tg) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-06-287Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 20, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 1, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-08-208Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-08-21MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by September 27, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 21, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 08/21/2019)
2019-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-09-279Joint STATUS REPORT by CATHERINE HITCH. (Estes, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-09-30MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by November 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 30, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-3110Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by December 4, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 1, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-12-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-05MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by January 14, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 5, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2020. (tg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2020-01-1412Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-14MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by February 19, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 14, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2020. (tg) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-02-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 19, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 20, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 3/19/2020. (tg) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-03-1814NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of L. FRANCIS CISSNA Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-1815Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by April 2, 2020, a further joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 19, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 4/2/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-04-0216Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by April 30, 2020, a further joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 2, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2020. (tg) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-3017Joint STATUS REPORT by L. FRANCIS CISSNA. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to file, by July 1, 2020, a further joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 1, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2020. (tg) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar