Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZAMOR v. MONARCH SHIPPING CO. LTD et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00760
Date Filed2019-03-19
Date Closed2019-04-17
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffKURT ZAMOR Assemble Diaspora Haitien, Haitens vivant en Haiti, Ville de St. Marc, Ville de Gonaives
DefendantMONARCH SHIPPING CO. LTD In Personam
DefendantCINDY LOU TEETERS
DefendantUNITED STATES COAST GUARD
DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantC. P. SCRABA Captain, U.S. Coast Guard
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-19Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/19/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-191COMPLAINT against MONARCH SHIPPING CO. LTD, C. P. SCRABA, CINDY LOU TEETERS, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION filed by KURT ZAMOR. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-192MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KURT ZAMOR (zsb) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-04-174MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/2019. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-175ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. See order for details. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/2019. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar