Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMANATT et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2019cv01163
Date Filed2019-03-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON
PlaintiffDANIEL MANATT
PlaintiffGAREN MEGUERIAN
Case DescriptionDaniel Manatt, an attorney and documentary filmmaker, and Garen Meguerian, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning it zero-tolerance policy. Manatt and Meguerian also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Manatt and Meguerian that it was searching for responsive records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Manatt and Meguerian filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [26]
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 194279.), filed by DANIEL MANATT, GAREN MEGUERIAN.(fdc) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-19Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: Garen Meguerian, U.S. Attorney's Office on 3/20/19. (fdc) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-202Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jaa, ) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-04-093AFFIDAVIT of Service by Karen West re: served Complaint, Summons upon William Barr; Lee Francis Cissna; Kirstjen Nielsen by Certified Mail, USPS on April 1, 2019; March 29, 2019 (MEGUERIAN, GAREN) Modified on 4/10/2019 (tjd). (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-194NOTICE of Appearance by JUDITH A. AMOROSA on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (AMOROSA, JUDITH) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-245STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED FOR THIRTY DATS TO AND INCLUDING MAY 17, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/24/19. 4/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-256NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/23/2019 05:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: # 1 Electronic Discovery Order, # 2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-05-167Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Certificate of Service.(AMOROSA, JUDITH) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-178ORDERED THAT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFFS SHALL WITHDRAW THEIR COMPLAINT OR FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC. AND THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, MAY 23, 2019 IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/17/19.5/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-209ORDERED THAT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFFS SHALL WITHDRAW THEIR COMPLAINT OR FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; THE DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE 30 DAYS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, IF ONE IS FILED; AND THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, MAY 23, 2019 IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/20/19. 5/21/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-06-1710AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, filed by DANIEL MANATT, GAREN MEGUERIAN., EXHIBITS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(rf, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-2611ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE TO HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/25/19. 6/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-07-0312ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/24/2019 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/3/19. 7/3/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-0813Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants to Amended Complaint & other relief filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Certificate of Service.(AMOROSA, JUDITH) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0914ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO ALLOW 60 DAYS FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/9/19.7/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-1715ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(AMOROSA, JUDITH) Modified on 7/19/2019 (tjd). (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-2416Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON Pretrial Conference held on 7/24/19 (jaa, ) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-2517SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL COMPLETE THEIR RE-REVIEW OF DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY IDENTIFIED AS EXEMPT FROM DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO 5 USC:552(b)(5), NO LATER THAN 8/30/19. DEFENDANTS SHALL COMPLETE THEIR RE-REVIEW OF ALL OTHER DOCUMENTS WITHHELD ON THE BASIS OF ALTERNATE EXEMPTIONS NO LATER THAN 9/30/19. DEFENDANTS SHALL FURNISH A VAUGHN INDEX TO PLAINTIFFS NO LATER THAN 11/1/19. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED BY 11/22/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/25/19. 7/25/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-11-1918Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for summary judgment filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Certificate of Service.(AMOROSA, JUDITH) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-2019ORDERED THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IS GRANTED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 11/20/19.11/20/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-12-2020MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order, # 3 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(AMOROSA, JUDITH) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-2321ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM COURT ORDERED DEADLINE AND TO EXTEND THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINE (ECF NO. 20 ), AND IN LIGHT OF THE FACT THAT DEFENDANTS HAVE BEEN AWARE OF THE DEADLINE FOR A FULL MONTH AND YET WAITED UNTIL 4:48 P.M. ON THE DAY OF THE DEADLINE TO SEEK AN EXTENSION OF THE SAME, THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE MOTION IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/23/2019.12/23/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2020-01-0922MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL MANATT, GAREN MEGUERIAN. Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Undisputed Facts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U)(MEGUERIAN, GAREN) Modified on 1/13/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-0923MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 3 Exhibit A to Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 4 Exhibit B to Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 5 Exhibit C to Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 6 Exhibit D to Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(AMOROSA, JUDITH) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-1024Memorandum of Law to Motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DANIEL MANATT, GAREN MEGUERIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Response to the Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEGUERIAN, GAREN) Modified on 1/14/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-2325Memorandum in RESPONSE to Motion re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Response to Rule 56 statement, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit C)(AMOROSA, JUDITH) Modified on 1/27/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-07-2026MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 07/20/2020. 07/202020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-2027ORDER DENYING 22 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AS TO COUNT IV AND DENYING IN PART 23 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT A HEARING WILL BE HELD ON AUGUST 13, 2020 AT 10:00 AM, VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE, CONCERNING DHS'S COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 20, 2019. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 07/20/2020. 07/20/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-20Set/Reset Hearings: HEARING SET FOR 8/13/2020 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. (ja, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-3128STATUS REPORT (Update) by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(AMOROSA, JUDITH) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar