Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Fee Status: Paid $400/Receipt number 0090-6010413) filed by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons ICE, # 4 Summons US AG, # 5 Summons US Attorney DC)(Jimenez, Losmin) Modified on 3/20/2019 to correct party against(zrdj). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/20/2019) (zef, ). Modified on 3/20/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | | Payment for 1 Complaint,. ($400; Receipt number 0090-6010413). (Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/25/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) Modified date served on 3/27/2019 (ztd). (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/26/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/25/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-04-05 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 8 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support Thereof by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-25 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before May 24, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 25, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/24/2019. (tj) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before June 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 28, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Briefing Schedule due by 6/11/2019. (hs) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-11 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 06/11/2019) |
2019-06-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant ICE will complete a search for records potentially responsive to Plaintiff Advancement Project's FOIA request as soon as possible. It is FURTHER ORDERED that ICE will make its first production of records by no later than July 8, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report on or before July 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 12, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 06/12/2019) |
2019-07-11 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 07/11/2019) |
2019-07-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 11, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/11/2019) |
2019-07-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-08-12 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 08/12/2019) |
2019-08-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 12, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/12/2019) |
2019-08-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-10-10 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/10/2019) |
2019-10-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their next joint status report on December 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 10, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/10/2019) |
2019-12-11 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further status report on January 30, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 11, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/30/2020. (tj) (Entered: 12/12/2019) |
2020-01-30 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/30/2020) |
2020-01-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their next joint status report by February 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 30, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/30/2020) |
2020-02-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/27/2020. (tj) (Entered: 02/05/2020) |
2020-02-27 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-02-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their next joint status report by March 31, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 27, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-03-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/31/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/13/2020) |
2020-03-30 | 17 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-03-30 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-03-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their next joint status report by June 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 30, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-03-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/1/2020. (tj) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-06-01 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 06/01/2020) |
2020-06-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 31, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/02/2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 06/02/2020) |
2020-06-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/31/2020. (tj) (Entered: 06/02/2020) |
2020-07-31 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/31/2020) |
2020-07-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/31/2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/31/2020) |
2020-07-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/15/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/31/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/15/2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/15/2020. (tj) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-10-15 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/15/2020) |
2020-10-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/16/2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/16/2020) |
2020-10-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/17/2020. (tj) (Entered: 10/16/2020) |
2020-11-17 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/17/2020) |
2020-11-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 23 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/17/2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/17/2020) |
2020-11-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2021. (zgdf) (Entered: 11/18/2020) |
2021-01-06 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-01-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 24 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/6/2021. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-01-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/6/2021 (tj) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-02-19 | 25 | STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 02/19/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |