Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00790
Date Filed2019-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's funding of various non-profit groups in Poland. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Judicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Agency for International Development for records pertaining to USAID's funding of the Polish non-profit groups. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6014073) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State, # 5 Summons U.S. Agency for International Development)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-223SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-224STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are directed to read and strictly comply with the attached order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/22/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-016ERRATA re 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachment: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona); Modified on 4/2/2019 (tth). (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-097NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-05-028ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-03MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to the Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by the Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn Index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the report on or before June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/3/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar