Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00795
Date Filed2019-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning communications between agency officials, including its Miami office, and CNN pertaining to the arrest of Roger Stone. Judicial Watch also submitted a FOIA request to the Justice Department's Office of Special Counsel for records pertaining to communications between officials and CNN regarding the arrest of Roger Stone. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6014633) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-295NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Michelle Kopplin on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-016ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-01MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure on or before May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/01/2019. (lccrc3) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/15/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-147Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar