Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMORLEY v. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00797
Date Filed2019-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJEFFERSON MORLEY
Case DescriptionReporter Jefferson Morley submitted a FOIA request to the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Morley filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
20th C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20551
DefendantBOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-211COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6015044) filed by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USADC, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons Fed)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-222SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-283ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/27/19. (DM) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/28/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-296NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-297ANSWER to Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-298ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/29/2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 5/27/2019. (dot) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-289STATUS REPORT by JEFFERSON MORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-29Minute Order: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report. Defendant states that it is currently consulting with two submitters of information to determine and resolve any objections to the release of the potentially confidential information. Defendant indicates that it expects to make a final determination and issue a final response on both submitters' records by July 31, 2019. Plaintiff argues that the delay in obtaining a response from the submitters of the potentially confidential information is unreasonable. Plaintiff requests that the Court require final processing and release of the non-exempt responsive records by the June 30, 2019. Plaintiff explains that due to communication issues, Defendant has not had the opportunity to respond to Plaintiff's specific concerns about timing. The Court ORDERS Defendant to file a short Status Report by JUNE 5, 2019, responding to Plaintiff's concerns about the timing of the processing and release of the responsive documents. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5-29-2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Status Report due by 6/5/2019, responding to Plaintiff's concerns about the timing of the processing and release of the responsive documents. (dot) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-0510STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-07Minute Order: The Court is in receipt of the Defendant's 10 Status Report. Defendant reports that, in reviewing Plaintiff's FOIA request it identified nearly 4,000 pages submitted to the Board by two third parties requesting confidential treatment. The Board now requires time to confer with the third parties to determine whether the requests for confidential treatment are valid. Because the Defendant is conferring with third parties in an effort to determine whether or not the third-party submissions can be released to Plaintiff, the Court finds that Defendant's timeline for issuing a final determination and final response on July 31, 2019 is reasonable. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Status Report by AUGUST 14, 2019, informing the Court on next steps for moving forward. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/7/2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar