Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against Department of Justice, Federal Bureau Investigation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13189686.). Filed byCenter for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Government Response, Request No. NFP-102340, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Government Response, Request No. NFP-102341, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Government Response, Request No. 1387511-000, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sun, Christine) (Filed on 3/21/2019) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 2 | Proposed Summons. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 3/21/2019) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 3 | Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 4 | First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nusrat Choudhury ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13191089.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Choudhury, Nusrat) (Filed on 3/21/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 5 | First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Joshua D. Riegel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13191153.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Riegel, Joshua) (Filed on 3/21/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Abre Leann Conner (Conner, Abre) (Filed on 3/21/2019) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 7 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Hugh Handeyside ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13193733.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Handeyside, Hugh) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 8 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | | Electronic filing error . Incorrect case number re: 6 Notice of Appearance filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Me dia Justice. Please ensure that all documents filed have the case number 4:19-cv-01465-DMR [err201]. No further action is necessary. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 9 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice and Federal Bureau of Investigation. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/22/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 10 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Mark Carter ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13194240.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carter, Mark) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 11 | ***WRONG EVENT USED, MUST BE REFILED*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union. All Defendants. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-25 | | Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used. [err101]. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 11 Summons Returned Executed, filed by American Civil Lib erties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. Please re-file in its entirety. Use the event: Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Returned Executed as to USA FOIA. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 12 | SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Center for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union. All Defendants. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 13 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 4 Nusrat J. Choudhury's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 14 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 5 Joshua David Riegel's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 15 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Hugh Handeyside's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-03-25 | 16 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 10 Mark Carter's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) (Entered: 03/25/2019) |
2019-04-05 | 17 | CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-04-12 | 18 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
2019-04-12 | 19 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019) |
2019-04-17 | 20 | STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice and Center For Media Justice; American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/18/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/17/2019) |
2019-04-19 | 21 | CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/3/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019) (Entered: 04/19/2019) |
2019-05-06 | 22 | SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/20/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-15 | 23 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice.. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/15/2019) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-05-23 | 24 | Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/23/2019) (Entered: 05/23/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 25 | ***Incorrect PDF attached, see docket 29 *** ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by American Civil Liberties Union (Riegel, Joshua) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 26 | ***Incorrect PDF attached, see docket 30 *** ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Riegel, Joshua) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 27 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/29/2019) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 28 | ***Incorrect PDF attached, see docket 31 *** ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Center for Media Justice (Riegel, Joshua) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 29 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for American Civil Liberties Union (Riegel, Joshua) (Filed on 5/30/2019) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 30 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Riegel, Joshua) (Filed on 5/30/2019) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 31 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Center for Media Justice (Riegel, Joshua) (Filed on 5/30/2019) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-04 | 32 | AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against All Defendants. Filed byCenter for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Government Response, Request No. NFP-102340, # 3 Exhibit C - Government Response, Request No. NFP-102341, # 4 Exhibit D - Government Response, Request No. 1387511-000)(Choudhury, Nusrat) (Filed on 6/4/2019) (Entered: 06/04/2019) |
2019-06-12 | 33 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice, U.S. Department of Justice and Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Choudhury, Nusrat) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2019) |
2019-06-18 | 34 | ANSWER to Amended Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019) |
2019-06-19 | 35 | PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/19/2019 2:16:46 PM ]. File Size [ 18208 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:37:56 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 06/19/2019) |
2019-06-19 | 36 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/19/2019. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM. See minute Order for more particulars. FTR Time: 2:16-2:54. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 37 | NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Pamela T. Johann (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-08-02 | 38 | NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joshua David Riegel (Riegel, Joshua) (Filed on 8/2/2019) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-09 | 39 | NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/9/2019) (Entered: 08/09/2019) |
2019-08-14 | 40 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2019) |
2019-08-21 | 41 | SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Filed byCenter for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Choudhury, Nusrat) (Filed on 8/21/2019) Modified on 8/21/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/21/2019) |
2019-08-21 | 42 | PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/21/2019 2:00:33 PM ]. File Size [ 9920 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:20:40 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 08/21/2019) |
2019-08-21 | 43 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/21/2019. See minute Order for all particulars. Update Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. FTR Time: 2:00-2:21. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-09-09 | 44 | Defendants' Answer to 41 Second Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief for Violation of The Freedom of Information Act by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 9/9/2019) Modified on 9/10/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/09/2019) |
2019-09-26 | 45 | NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Abre Leann Conner (Conner, Abre) (Filed on 9/26/2019) (Entered: 09/26/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 46 | STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Continuation of Case Management Conference filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice, U.S. Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Choudhury, Nusrat) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/3/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-02 | 47 | MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Choudhury, Nusrat) (Filed on 10/2/2019) (Entered: 10/02/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 48 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 46 Stipulation to Continue: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2019. Further Case Management Conference continued to 10/30/2019 01:30 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 49 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying as moot 47 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 10/16/2019 01:30 PM further case management conference per 48 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-16 | 50 | MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Choudhury, Nusrat) (Filed on 10/16/2019) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2019-10-17 | 51 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Further Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2019 01:30 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/18/2019) |
2019-10-23 | 52 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union and Center for Media Justice . (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 10/23/2019) Modified on 10/23/2019 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-10-24 | 53 | ORDER: The court has reviewed the parties' updated joint case management statement 52 . The 10/30/2019 01:30 further case management conference is vacated and continued to 11/20/2019. The parties' updated joint case management conference statement will be due 11/13/2019, and shall include a proposed processing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/24/19. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019) |
2019-11-06 | 54 | MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Carter, Mark) (Filed on 11/6/2019) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-11-08 | 55 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 54 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Further Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2019 01:30 PM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-13 | 56 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, Center for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 11/13/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/13/2019) |
2019-11-20 | 57 | PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/20/2019 1:41:52 PM ]. File Size [ 5064 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:33 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 11/20/2019) |
2019-11-20 | 58 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/20/2019. By 12/13/2019, the parties shall file a joint stipulation and proposed order regarding a processing schedule. If the parties cannot agree, each side shall propose a processing schedule along with supporting legal authority. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2020 01:30 PM. FTR Time: 1:41-1:52. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019) |
2019-12-13 | 59 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING PROCESSING SCHEDULE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit to Hardy Declaration)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 12/13/2019) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2019-12-13 | 60 | Statement Relating to Defendants' Processing of Responsive Documents and [Proposed] Order Regarding Processing Schedule by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A Email from Emmet Ong to Mark Carter, # 2 Appendix B Transcript of Proceedings- Case No. 17-cv-04782)(Carter, Mark) (Filed on 12/13/2019) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 61 | NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Nusrat Choudhury (Choudhury, Nusrat) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2020-01-30 | 62 | NOTICE of Change of Address by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020) |
2020-03-03 | 63 | MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Carter, Mark) (Filed on 3/3/2020) (Entered: 03/03/2020) |
2020-03-04 | 64 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 63 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Further Case Management Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020) |
2020-03-11 | 65 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/11/2020) Modified on 3/12/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/11/2020) |
2020-03-16 | 66 | CLERK'S NOTICE: In light of the current public health emergency caused by COVID-19, the court issues the following Notice with the aim of balancing public health and safety concerns, including minimizing the risk of exposure, with the need for scheduling certainty and having civil matters proceed regularly. The currently scheduled Further Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2020 01:30 PM shall be held telephonically through CourtCall. No requests for telephonic appearance are required. The parties shall follow the CourtCall protocol set forth in the Notice re: Telephonic Appearance Procedures for Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, available on the court's website. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020). (Entered: 03/16/2020) |
2020-03-17 | 67 | CLERK'S NOTICE: In light of the current public health emergency caused by COVID-19, the court issues the following Notice with the aim of balancing public health and safety concerns, including minimizing the risk of exposure, with the need for scheduling certainty and having civil matters proceed regularly. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 3/18/2020 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 4/15/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement by no later than 4/8/2020. The 4/15/2020 Further Case Management Conference shall be held telephonically through CourtCall. No requests for telephonic appearance are required. The parties shall follow the CourtCall protocol set forth in the Notice re: Telephonic Appearance Procedures for Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, available on the courts website. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020) |
2020-03-18 | 68 | AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE: The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 3/18/2020 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 4/15/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement by no later than 4/8/2020. The Further Case Management Conference will be held telephonically through the court's conference line. Parties must dial in to the conference line at least 10 minutes before the start of the calendar. In order to avoid disruption, late appearances will not be permitted. The court may not be able to record certain CMC calendars. The court will inform the parties if the CMC is not being recorded. No recorded proceedings will be uploaded to the ECF docket. The conference line number is 888-684-8852. The access code is 2071514. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-03-30 | 69 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TEMPORARY STAY OF PROCESSING AND PRODUCTION SCHEDULE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation American Civil Liberties Union and Center for Media Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF MICHAEL G. SEIDEL)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/30/2020) Modified on 3/31/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-04-02 | 70 | Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 69 Stipulation for Stay. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/02/2020) |
2020-04-08 | 71 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and Center for Media Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 4/8/2020) Modified on 4/9/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/08/2020) |
2020-04-15 | 72 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/15/2020. See minute Order for all particulars. Updated joint Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2020 01:30 PM. **NOTE: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/15/2020 was by Telephone. FTR Time: 1:42-2:00. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2020) Modified on 4/16/2020 (ig, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/16/2020) |
2020-05-07 | 73 | MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong, # 2 Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 5/7/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020) |
2020-05-08 | 74 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14450744.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Romo, Gerardo) (Filed on 5/8/2020) (Entered: 05/08/2020) |
2020-05-08 | 75 | ORDER: The court has reviewed Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration 73 . Plaintiffs shall file a response by May 15, 2020. The parties shall meet and confer to determine whether they can reach a stipulated resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/8/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020) (Entered: 05/08/2020) |
2020-05-11 | 76 | ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. ryu granting 74 Gerardo Romo's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020) |
2020-05-15 | 77 | OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 73 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Romo, Gerardo) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020) |
2020-05-18 | 78 | OBJECTIONS to re 77 Opposition/Response to Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020) |
2020-06-05 | 79 | ORDER on Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration 73 by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. The case is stayed until June 30, 2020. Defendants must complete processing the 600 remaining documents by July 31, 2020. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020) (Entered: 06/05/2020) |
2020-07-08 | 80 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice.. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 7/8/2020) Modified on 7/9/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/08/2020) |
2020-07-08 | 81 | ORDER granting 80 Stipulation to Continue: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2020. Further Case Management Conference continued to 8/5/2020 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/8/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) (Entered: 07/08/2020) |
2020-07-29 | 82 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, Center for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/30/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/29/2020) |
2020-07-30 | 83 | ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 82 Joint Case Management Statement: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2020 01:30 PM continued to 11/4/2020 01:30 PM. Parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement by 10/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/30/20. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020) |
2020-08-12 | 84 | NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gerardo Romo (Romo, Gerardo) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020) |
2020-10-28 | 85 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, Center for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 10/28/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2020) |
2020-10-29 | 86 | ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. See Docket No. 85 .Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2020 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/29/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020) (Entered: 10/29/2020) |
2020-11-25 | 87 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union and Center for Media Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 11/25/2020) Modified on 11/25/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/25/2020) |
2020-11-25 | 88 | ORDER (AS MODIFIED) re 87 Stipulation and Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 12/2/2020 01:30 PM is continued to 1/6/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement by 12/30/2020. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscour ts.gov/zoom/ . Further Case Management Conference is continued to 1/6/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motions terminated: 87 Stipulation and Order to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/25/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020) |
2020-12-01 | 89 | Notice of Appearance of Christina E. Fletes-Romo as Counsel for Plaintiffs filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice. (Fletes-Romo, Christina) (Filed on 12/1/2020) Modified on 12/2/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/01/2020) |
2020-12-01 | 90 | NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Christina Elena Fletes-Romo for the Withdrawal of Counsel Abre' Leann Conner (Fletes-Romo, Christina) (Filed on 12/1/2020) (Entered: 12/01/2020) |
2020-12-01 | | Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Notice of Appearance. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[ 90] Notice of Change In Counsel filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020) |
2020-12-30 | 91 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Media Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 12/30/2020) Modified on 12/30/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2020) |
2020-12-30 | 92 | ORDER: By joint request of the parties in their 12/30/2020 joint case management conference statement 91 , the 1/6/2021 01:30 PM further case management conference is vacated and continued to 1/20/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. The parties shall submit an updated joint case management conference statement by 1/13/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photogr aphing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: http s://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/30/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020) |
2021-01-04 | 93 | NOTICE of Appearance by Angelica Salceda as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Salceda, Angelica) (Filed on 1/4/2021) (Entered: 01/04/2021) |
2021-01-13 | 94 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, Center for Media Justice, American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 1/13/2021) Modified on 1/14/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2021) |
2021-01-14 | 95 | ORDER (AS MODIFIED) re 94 : The further case managementconference set for 1/20/2021 01:30 PM is continued to 4/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. The parties shall file a joint case management statement by 4/14/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/14/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021). (Entered: 01/14/2021) |
2021-04-14 | 96 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Media Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/14/2021) |
2021-04-15 | 97 | ORDER (AS MODIFIED) re 96 : The further case management conference set for 4/21/2021 01:30 PM is continued to 5/12/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Parties shall file an updated joint Case Management Statement by 5/5/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/15/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021) |
2021-05-05 | 98 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union and Center for Media Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 5/5/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/05/2021) |
2021-05-06 | 99 | ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 98 : Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2021. Further Case Management Conference continued to 10/6/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/6/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2021) (Entered: 05/06/2021) |
2021-06-30 | 100 | NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Christina Fletes-Romoby Christina Elena Fletes-Romo (Fletes-Romo, Christina) (Filed on 6/30/2021) Modified on 7/1/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/30/2021) |
2021-09-15 | 101 | CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2021 01:30 PM is vacated and continued to 11/3/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Parties shall file an updated joint Case Management Statement by no later than 10/27/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photograp hing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https: //www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021) |
2021-10-27 | 102 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021) |
2021-10-28 | 103 | ORDER granting 102 stipulation. The case management conference presently scheduled for 11/3/2021 is vacated. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Oakland via Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/28/2021. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021) |
2021-12-08 | 104 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 12/8/2021) Modified on 12/8/2021 (jlg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2021) |
2021-12-09 | 105 | ORDER granting 104 stipulation. The case management conference scheduled for 12/15/2021 is hereby vacated and continued until 1/19/2022. The parties shall file a joint case management statement by 1/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/9/2021. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2021) (Entered: 12/09/2021) |
2021-12-09 | | ***Deadlines terminated., Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2021) (Entered: 12/09/2021) |
2021-12-28 | 106 | NOTICE of Withdrawal by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Center for Media Justice Withdrawal of Hugh Handeyside (Handeyside, Hugh) (Filed on 12/28/2021) Modified on 12/29/2021 (ark, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2021) |
2022-01-12 | 107 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022) |
2022-01-13 | 108 | ORDER [AS MODIFIED] granting 107 Stipulation to Continue Further Case Management Conference: Parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement by 2/23/2022. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 1/19/2022 01:30 PM is vacated and continued to 3/2/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing , recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://ww w.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/13/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022) |
2022-02-22 | 109 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 2/22/2022) (Entered: 02/22/2022) |
2022-02-23 | 110 | ORDER granting 109 stipulation. Further Case Management Conference continued until 3/30/2022 at 1:30 PM in Oakland via Zoom Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/23/2022. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/23/2022) |
2022-03-23 | 111 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/23/2022) (Entered: 03/23/2022) |
2022-03-24 | 112 | CLERK'S NOTICE: At the parties' joint request, the Further Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2022 01:30 PM is vacated and continued to 5/4/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. The parties shall file an updated joint Case Management Conference Statement by 4/27/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022) (Entered: 03/24/2022) |
2022-04-27 | 113 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 4/27/2022) (Entered: 04/27/2022) |
2022-04-27 | 114 | ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 113 joint stipulation to continue Further Case Management Conference: Further Case Management Conference continued to 6/1/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Parties shall file an updated joint Case Management Statement by 5/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/27/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022). (Entered: 04/27/2022) |
2022-05-25 | 115 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 5/25/2022) (Entered: 05/25/2022) |
2022-05-26 | 116 | ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 115 joint stipulation to continue Further Case Management Conference: Further Case Management Conference continued to 7/20/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Parties shall file an updated joint Case Management Statement by 7/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/26/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2022). (Entered: 05/26/2022) |
2022-07-13 | 117 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022) |
2022-07-14 | 118 | ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 117 Joint request to continue the Further Case Management Conference. If the parties do not file a stipulation regarding dismissal by 9/14/2022, parties shall instead file an updated joint case management conference statement. Further Case Management Conference is continued to 9/21/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/14/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022) |
2022-07-26 | 119 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022) |
2022-07-28 | 120 | Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 119 Stipulation. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022) (Entered: 07/28/2022) |
2022-07-28 | | ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/28/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022) (Entered: 07/28/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |