Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00810
Date Filed2019-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD 19cv957 plaintiff
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC. 19cv957 plaintiff
PlaintiffDAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
PlaintiffDAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request for records concerning the investigation into Russian interference with the 2016 presidential election. EPIC also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
DefendantDAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
TERMINATED: 04/05/2019
DefendantDAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
P.O. Box 9063
Miramar Beach, FL 32550
DefendantDAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
P.O. Box 9063
Miramar Beach, FL 32550
CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
DefendantLEONARD W. HOUSTON
DefendantCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
AppealD.C. Circuit 19-5121
AppealD.C. Circuit 20-5364
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [111]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Reggie Walton has ruled that because of questions he has about Attorney General William Barr's credibility in describing the findings of the Mueller Report, he will conduct an in camera review of the unredacted report to determine if the Department of Justice's exemption claims are appropriate. Ruling in a consolidated case brought by EPIC and BuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold for unredacted copies of the Mueller Report, Walton indicated that "the Court has grave concerns about the objectivity of the process that preceded the public release of the redacted version of the Mueller Report and its impact on the Department's subsequent justifications that its redactions of the Mueller Report are authorized by the FOIA." He pointed out that "the speed by which Attorney General Barr released to the public the summary of Special Counsel Mueller's principal conclusions, coupled with the facts that Attorney General Barr failed to provide a thorough representation of the findings set forth in the Mueller Report causes the Court to question whether Attorney General Barr's intent was to create a one-side narrative about the Mueller Report �" a narrative that is clearly in some respects substantively at odds with the redacted version of the Mueller Report." Walton noted that "Attorney General Barr's lack of candor specifically, calls into question Attorney General Barr's credibility, and in turn, the Department's representation that 'all of the information redacted from the version of the Mueller Report released by Attorney General Barr' is protected by its claimed FOIA exemptions. In the Court's view, Attorney General Barr's representation that the Mueller Report would be 'subject only to [appropriate] redactions. . .cannot be credited without the Court's independent verification in light of Attorney General Barr's conduct and misleading public statements about the findings in the Mueller Report and it would be disingenuous for the Court to conclude that the redactions of the Mueller Report pursuant to the FOIA are not tainted by Attorney General Barr's actions and representations." He questioned whether the redactions "are self-serving and were made to support, or at the very least to not undermine, Attorney General Barr's public statements and whether the Department engaged in post-hoc rationalization to justify Attorney General Barr's positions." Walton concluded that "the actions of Attorney Genera Barr and his representations about the Mueller Report preclude the Court's acceptance of the validity of the Department's redactions without its independent verification."
Issues: Litigation - In camera review
Opinion/Order [130]
FOIA Project Annotation: After conducting an in camera review of the unredacted Mueller Report on Russian interference in the 2016 presidential election, Judge Reggie Walton has ruled that while the Department of Justice properly withheld records under Exemption 3 (other statutes), Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding), Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records), and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods or techniques), the agency failed to justify its Exemption 5 (privileges) claims. Walton's ruling came in a consolidated case brought by BuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold and EPIC for an unredacted copy of the Mueller Report. Since the report was initially redacted by DOJ at the time it was first released to the public, Walton decided it was necessary to view the report in camera to properly assess the application of the claimed exemptions. The agency withheld information under Exemption 3, citing Rule 6(e) on grand jury secrecy and the National Security Act. Walton found both had been properly applied. He rejected Leopold and EPIC's argument that some of the grand jury information had been made public. Instead, he pointed out that "although the identity of [Paul] Manafort as a grand jury witness may have been previously disclosed, 'citations to grand jury testimony would necessarily divulge the substance of the testimony,' and the disclosure of any additional information would reveal more than what is publicly available. Therefore, the Court finds that there has been no waiver of information by the government through official acknowledgment as to any of the individuals identified by the Leopold plaintiffs." Walton found that DOJ had appropriately redacted personally identifying information under Exemption 7(C). He noted that "the individuals identified by plaintiffs as public figures. . .nevertheless maintain an interest that is protectable under Exemption 7(C)." He added that "although an individual's 'interest in privacy fades when the information involved already appears on the public record,' 'the fact that an event is not wholly private does not mean that an individual has no interest in limiting disclosure or dissemination of the requested information." EPIC argued that some redactions under Exemption 7(E) did not qualify as techniques. Walton observed that "although the redacted information itself may not be 'a technique, procedure, or guideline,' with the disclosure of such information 'comes the knowledge of how the agency employs its procedures or techniques.'" Walton indicated that the names of individuals not charged with a crime were not protected by the deliberative process privilege. He pointed out that "mere identities of individuals not charged with having committed crimes in this context are neither predecisional nor deliberative." More broadly, Walton observed that "information withheld by the Department is not predecisional because, as plaintiffs correctly note, it is the decision of Special Counsel Mueller and such information is not protected by the deliberative process privilege."
Issues: Exemption 5 - Privileges - Deliberative process privilege - Deliberative, Exemption 5 - Privileges - Deliberative process privilege - Predecisional, Exemption 3 - Limited agency discretion
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6017881) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Davisson, John) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Davisson, John) (Entered: 03/23/2019)
2019-03-25Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/25/2019. (Davisson, John) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-265MOTION for Leave to Join and Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (jf) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-296NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Danielle Enlow on behalf of All Defendants (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-297MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Index, # 4 Exhibit Nos. 1-7)(Davisson, John) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-018RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019. (Davisson, John) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-019RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Davisson, John) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-0110GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 1, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-0111ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that David Christenson's 5 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Join and Intervene is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that David Christenson shall file his motion to join or intervene on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 4, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Department shall file its opposition to David Christenson's motion to join or intervene on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Department shall file its opposition to the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on or before April 5, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its motion on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on April 9, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 1, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-0112NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Jay Butler on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: David Christenson shall file his motion to join or intervene on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 4, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Department shall file its opposition to David Christenson's motion to join or intervene on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Department shall file its opposition to the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on or before April 5, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its motion on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on April 9, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-0213LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's motion for leave to memorandum concerning my 20 year exercise in futility This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file is denied." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/2/19. (ztd) Modified to add text on 4/3/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-0214NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-0415LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson's Motion for Leave to Memorandum concerning my 20-year exercise in futility This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file is Denied," Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/4/19. (ztd) Modified to add text on 4/5/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0416MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (Attachments: # 1 Attachments 1-4)(ztd) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0517MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 MOTION to Intervene by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (ztd); ("Leave to file is Granted" signed 4/5/19 by Judge Walton) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0518RESPONSE re 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 MOTION to Intervene, 16 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0519RESPONSE re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Vanessa Brinkmann)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0520ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that Mr. Christenson's 16 Motion to Join and Intervene per Judge Walton's Order dated April 1[], 2019, is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the Court's April 1, 2019 Order, ECF No. 11, to the extent that it requires the Department to file its opposition to Mr. Christenson's motion to join or intervene on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 8, 2019, is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that Mr. Christenson's 17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Motion to Join and Intervene and Open Letter to Judge Reggie B. Walton is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 5, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0821REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-0822LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Letter to Judge Walton This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File is Denied." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/8/19. (ztd) Modified to add text on 4/9/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-0823NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Main Document 23 replaced on 4/9/2019) (ztd). (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-09Minute Entry; Proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Motion Hearing held on 4/9/2019 re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. Oral Ruling issued Denying Without Prejudice 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Status Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0924ORDER. In accordance with the Court's oral rulings issued at the motion hearing held on the same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the 7 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Specifically, the motion is denied because the plaintiff has not satisfied its burden of demonstrating that it faces irreparable harm in the absence of an injunction. It is further ORDERED that the government shall file its answer to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 25, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court on May 2, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss how the parties wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 9, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-1025TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on April 9, 2019; Page Numbers: 1 - 27. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 2023543246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 5/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2019.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-1126ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 19, 2019, the parties in the above-captioned matters shall SHOW CAUSE as to why the cases should not be consolidated. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 11, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses to Show Cause Order due by 4/19/2019. (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-12Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1227RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 26 Order, . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1231LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson's motion for leave to file a critical example of why I should prevail on behalf of you, your family, all American and Mankind This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/12/19. (ztd) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-1629NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 20 Order on Motion to Intervene,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. ("Leave to file granted" signed 4/16/19 by Judge Walton) (ztd) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-1828RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER re 26 Order, . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1 (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit No. 1 (Part 2 of 2))(Davisson, John) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-1832LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Christenson's (2) Motion to Appoint Justice (Retired) Richard A. Posner as Co-Counsel; (2) Motion for Leave to file supplemental Motion to Reconsider; and Motion for leave to file motion to reconsider This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/18/19. (ztd) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2230Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 29 Notice of Appeal,. (ztd) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2233ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' obligations under the Court's April 11, 2019 Order to Show Cause are DISCHARGED. It is further ORDERED that, to the extent that the plaintiffs in the above-captioned matters are seeking the release of the Special Counsel Mueller's report regarding the investigation into Russian interference in the 2016 United States presidential election, Case No. 19-cv-810 is CONSOLIDATED with Case No. 19-cv-957. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall make all future filings only in Case No. 19-cv-810, and the Clerk of the Court shall refuse to accept any filings in Case No. 19-cv-957. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 22, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2240LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Motion for leave to file supplemental motion to reconsider This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File is denied," Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/22/19. (ztd) Modified to add text on 5/7/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-04-2241LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Notice We Have Blood on Our Hands... This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File is denied," Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/22/19. (ztd) Modified to add text on 5/7/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-04-2242LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Motion to Appoint Justice (Retired) Richard A. Posner as Co-Counsel This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File is denied," Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/22/19. (ztd) Modified to add text on 5/7/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-04-2334NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 20 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2535Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 34 Notice of Appeal. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2536ANSWER to Complaint from Electronic Privacy Information Center by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2537ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Leopold and Buzzfeed, Inc. in consolidated action 19-cv-957 by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-26USCA Case Number 19-5121 for 34 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-3038STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-0139STATUS REPORT by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-02Minute Entry for Status Conference proceedings held on 5/2/2019 before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Defendant's summary judgment motions due by 6/3/2019. Plantiffs'response to the summary judgment and cross motions for summary judgment due by 6/24/2019. Reply to motions for summary judgment and response to cross motions due by 7/8/2019. Reply to cross motions due by 7/15/2019. Status Report on the remaining records due by 6/17/2019. Status Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16. Status Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(gdf) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-0343ORDER.In accordance with the Cour's oral rulings issued at the status conference held on the May 2, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before May 6, 2019, the defendant shall produce to the plaintiffs a redacted copy of Special Counsel Mueller's report regarding the investigation into Russian interference in the 2016 United States presidential election with the appropriate exemption markings under the Freedom of Information Act. It is further ORDERED that the parties' obligation to submit a statement of material facts with their respective motions for summary judgment under Local Civil Rule 7(h)(1) is WAIVED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before June 3, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Electronic Privacy Information Center's request that the defendant submit, for in camera review, the original, unredacted version of the Special Counsel Mueller's report regarding the investigation into Russian interference in the 2016 United States presidential election with the filing of its motion for summary judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendant's motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before June 24, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its combined reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion on or before July 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of any cross-motion on or before July 15, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on August 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for a hearing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before June 3, 2019, the defendant shall produce all non-exempt records responsive to Category 5 of the Electronic Privacy Information Center's FOIA request. It is further ORDERED that, on or before June 17, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint status report regarding how the case shall proceed with respect to the additional documents sought by the Electronic Privacy Information Center. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 2, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., in order to propose a production schedule to the Court for the additional documents sought by the Electronic Privacy Information Center. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 3, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/15/2019. Joint Status Report due by 6/17/2019 Summary Judgment motions due by 6/3/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment/Cross Motion due by 6/24/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/8/2019. (hs) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-2444RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 4/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2445RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 4/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2446RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL served on 4/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2447RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/15/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2448RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/15/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2449ORDER of USCA as to 34 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON ; USCA Case Number 19-5121. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-2450MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (zrdj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: # 1 Exhibit) (ztd). (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-2951LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Notice. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file is denied." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/29/19. (ztd) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-2952LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Notice. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file is Denied." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/29/19. (ztd) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-3153Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 53 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the page limitation prescribed in Local Civil Rule 7(e) is WAIVED with respect to the defendant's forthcoming memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that the defendant's memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment shall not exceed fifty-five (55) pages. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 3, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-0354MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Leopold v. DOJ , MOTION for Summary Judgment in EPIC v. DOJ by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit Brinkmann Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits to Brinkmann Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits to Brinkmann Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-0356LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Non-party David Andrew Christenson's Notice This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to filed is denied," Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/3/19. (ztd) Modified to add text on 6/5/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-0357ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- 6/3/19 This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/3/19. (ztd) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-0358NOTICE by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (ztd); ("Leave to file is granted" signed 6/3/19 by Judge Walton) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-0455NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibit by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Leopold v. DOJ MOTION for Summary Judgment in EPIC v. DOJ (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-1359LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Open Letter 2 to Judge Walton/Notice This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File is Denies," Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/13/19. (ztd) Modified on 6/19/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1360LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Open Letter 1 to Judge Walton/Notice This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File is Denied," Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/13/19. (ztd) Modified on 6/19/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14MINUTE ORDER. Due to a change in the Court's calendar, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for July 2, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., is CONTINUED to July 2, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 14, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-17Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 7/2/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(hs) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-1761Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-1864LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Open Letter 3 to Judge Walton/Notice This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/18/19. (ztd) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-1865LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Open Letter 4 to Judge Walton/Notice "Leave to file is denied because this submission is not related to any matter pending before this court." This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/18/19. (ztd) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-1866LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Open Letter to Judge Walton/Notice "Leave to file is denied because this submission is not related to any matter pending before this court." This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/18/19. (ztd) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-1867LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Open Letter 17 to Judge Walton/Notice "Leave to file is denied because the submission is unrelated to any matter pending before this court." This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/18/19. (ztd) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-1868LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's The End of Mankind "Leave to file is denied" This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/18/19. (ztd) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-1962MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 62 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limits, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the page limitation prescribed in Local Civil Rule 7(e) is WAIVED with respect to the plaintiffs' forthcoming memorandum in opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment shall not exceed fifty-five (55) pages. The parties are also reminded of their obligation, under 10 General Order for Civil Cases Before the Honorable Reggie B. Walton at 7-8, "to provide a courtesy copy of any filing that exceeds twenty (20) pages, including exhibits..., to the Courts chambers." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 20, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-2063ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before August 8, 2019, the defendant shall complete its searches for records responsive to the remaining categories of the plaintiff's FOIA request. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled on July 2, 2019, is CONTINUED to August 9, 2019, at 2:30 p.m., during which the parties shall propose a production schedule to the Court for the additional documents sought by the plaintiff. The defendant shall be prepared to provide an estimate of the number of records responsive to each categories of the plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 20, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-20Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (tj) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-20Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 8/9/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(hs) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-2469ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Jason Leopold's and BuzzFeed Inc.'s Combined Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) Modified on 6/25/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-2470Memorandum in opposition to re 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Leopold v. DOJ MOTION for Summary Judgment in EPIC v. DOJ Plaintiffs Jason Leopold's and BuzzFeed Inc.'s Combined Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-2471Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for In Camera Review by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit Nos. 1-5, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Alan). Added MOTION for In Camera Review on 6/25/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-2472Memorandum in opposition to re 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Leopold v. DOJ MOTION for Summary Judgment in EPIC v. DOJ filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit Nos. 1-5, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-25NOTICE OF ERROR re 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; emailed to matt@loevy.com, cc'd 13 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. The main document should be the Motion/Opposition and the Memorandum is the second part of the pdf. (ztd, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2573MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Jason Leopold's and BuzzFeed Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-26NOTICE OF ERROR re 73 Motion for Summary Judgment; emailed to matt@loevy.com, cc'd 13 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Please do not refile. In future, pleading must be signed. (ztth, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-2774ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's May 3, 2019 43 Order with respect to the briefing schedule of dispositive motions is CLARIFIED as follows: (1) on or before July 8, 2019, the Department of Justice shall file one submission that shall include (1) its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, if any, and (2) a combined opposition to the EPIC plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and the Leopold plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment; and (2) on or before July 15, 2019, the EPIC plaintiff and the Leopold plaintiffs shall jointly file a combined reply in support of their cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 27, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-2875MOTION for Leave to File amicus curiae brief by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(Shaw, Conor) Modified event title on 7/3/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2876NOTICE of Appearance by Conor M. Shaw on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Shaw, Conor) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-0277Memorandum in opposition to re (75 in 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 23 in 1:19-cv-00957-RBW) MOTION to Intervene as amicus curiae filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0578ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 5, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-0579AMICUS BRIEF by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (ztd) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motions due by 7/12/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(gdf) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-1280REPLY to opposition to motion re 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Leopold v. DOJ MOTION for Summary Judgment in EPIC v. DOJ filed by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Enlow, Courtney) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jf). (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1581RESPONSE re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Jason Leopold's and BuzzFeed Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment , 71 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for In Camera Review (same filing as in ECF No. 80) filed by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1982REPLY to opposition to motion re (73 in 1:19-cv-00810-RBW) MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Jason Leopold's and BuzzFeed Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment , (71 in 1:19-cv-00810-RBW) Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for In Camera Review filed by BUZZFEED INC., ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER, JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-31Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-05Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Oral Argument held on 8/5/2019. Memorandum\Order to issue via Chambers. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-08Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-09Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 8/9/2019. Status Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-1283TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on August 5, 2019; Page Numbers: 1 - 96. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 9/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2019.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-09-0384NOTICE of Change of Address by John L. Davisson (Davisson, John) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-1086LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Amicus This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. ("Leave to file is Denied.") Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/10/19. (ztd) Modified on 9/16/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-1087LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Amicus - Notice 65 This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. ("Leave to file is Denied"). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/10/19. (ztd) Modified on 9/16/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-1285ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties in the above-captioned cases shall appear before the Court on October 1, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. to discuss why these cases should not be consolidated or deemed related. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 12, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-12Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(hs) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-1988Joint STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO ADOPT A SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davisson, John) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 88 Joint Status Report and Motion to Adopt a Schedule for Further Proceedings, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before October 10, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for September 20, 2019, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 19, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-1989MOTION for Scheduling Order to adopt a schedule for further proceedings by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (ztd); (See docket entry no. 88 to view.) Modified event on 9/20/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-2090LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Amicus/Notice 67 This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/20/19. (ztd) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-2091LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Amicus/Notice 68 This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file Denied." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/23/19. (ztd) Modified on 9/26/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2019 (hs) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-2592LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Amicus-Notice 70 This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file Denied." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/25/19. (ztd) Modified on 9/26/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-09-2693LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Notice 69 submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file denied" Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 09/26/2019. (jf) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-09-2694LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Notice 71 submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file denied" Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 09/26/2019. (jf) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-09-2695LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Notice 72 submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file denied" Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 09/26/2019. (jf) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-01Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 10/1/2019. Production/Scheduling Order to issue via chambers. Status Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-0396LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Notice 73, Amicus/Notice 74 and Amicus Notice 75 This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File Denied." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/3/19. (ztd) Modified to add fiat on 10/11/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of David Christenson's 50 Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. The Deputy Clerk shall transmit this order promptly to the Court of Appeals. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall forthwith mail a copy of this Minute Order to Mr. Christenson's address on record. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 8, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-1097Joint STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO ADOPT A SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davisson, John) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-1098MOTION to adopt a schedule for further proceedings by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (ztd); (See docket entry no. 97 to view document.) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 97 Status Report; emailed to davisson@epic.org, cc'd 16 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. Remember to file all parts of your documents, if it contains multiple parts. (ztd, ) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-1199Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Minute Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, ; (ztd) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 97 Joint Status Report and Motion to Adopt a Schedule for Further Proceedings, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before November 8, 2019, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 11, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/8/2019 (tj) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-11100LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Amicus/Notice 81 This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to File is Denied." Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/11/19. (ztd) Modified to add text on 10/17/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2019 Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(hs) (Entered: 10/16/2019)
2019-11-08101Joint STATUS REPORT by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 101 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before February 7, 2020, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled in this case for November 13, 2019, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 12, 2019. (lcrbw1) Modified on 11/12/2019 to reflect November 13, 2019, instead of November 14, 2019 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2020 (hs) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-12102LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- David Andrew Christenson's Amicus/Notice 90 This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/9/19. (ztd); ("Leave to file is denied" signed 11/9/19 by Judge Walton) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-12-10103STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(Davisson, John) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 103 Plaintiffs' Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on December 18, 2019, at 12:30 p.m., to address the issues raised in the plaintiffs' status report. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 10, 2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-11Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
2019-12-17104ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 17, 2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-17105STATUS REPORT by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-18106RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 104 Order filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Davisson, John) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-18Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 12/18/2019. Parties addressed issues related to a related matter before Judge Walton. Court Reporter Tim Miller. (zjch) Modified on 12/19/2019 (zjch). (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2019-12-18107ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs' request that the Court order the United States Department of Justice to reprocess the report regarding Special Counsel Robert Mueller's investigation into Russian interference in the 2016 United States presidential election, raised in the Plaintiffs' Status Report, Elec. Privacy Info. Ctr. v. U.S. Dep't of Justice, Civ. Action No. 19-810, ECF No. 103, and the Plaintiffs' Status Report, Leopold v. U.S. Dep't of Justice, Civ. Action No. 19-957, ECF No. 27, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 18, 2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2020-01-23108TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on 12-18-19; Page Numbers: 1-22; Date of Issuance: 1-23-20; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2020.(Miller, Timothy) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-02-07109Joint STATUS REPORT by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 109 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Electronic Privacy Information Center ("EPIC") and the United States Department of Justice (the "Department") shall appear before the Court for a status conference on March 5, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. to discuss the status of the Department's production of the additional documents sought by EPIC. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 13, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/13/2020)
2020-02-13Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 02/13/2020)
2020-03-03110STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-05Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 3/5/2020. Written order to issue via Chambers. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05111MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 5, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05112ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the 54 Department of Justice's Motion for Summary Judgment in Leopold v. Department of Justice and Partial Summary Judgment in Electronic Privacy Information Center v. Department of Justice is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the 71 Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Motion for In Camera Review of the "Mueller Report" is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks in camera review of the unredacted version of the Mueller Report. The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that 73 Plaintiffs Jason Leopold's and Buzzfeed Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks in camera review of the unredacted version of the Mueller Report. The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that, on or before March 30, 2020, the United States Department of Justice shall submit the unredacted version of the Mueller Report to the Court for its in camera review. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 5, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-06113ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before March 13, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status report discussing how they wish to proceed in this case as to Categories 2 through 7 of the plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 6, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2020 (hs) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-13114Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 114 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before March 30, 2020, the United States Department of Justice shall submit unredacted copies of the final two pages of its October 10, 2019 production to the Court for its in camera review. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 16, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Unredacted copies of the final two pages of its October 10, 2019 production to the Court for its in camera review due by 3/30/2020. (hs) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-30115NOTICE of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re Order, 111 Memorandum & Opinion, 112 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Cover letter for in camera submission)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-30MINUTE NOTICE. Consistent with the 115 Defendant's Notice of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review, the Court has received the unredacted version of the report regarding Special Counsel Robert Mueller's investigation into Russian interference in the 2016 United States presidential election (the "Mueller Report"). However, in light of the Chief Judge Howell's March 16, 2020 Order Regarding Court Operations in Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic, Standing Order No. 20-9 (BAH), the Court's review of the unredacted version of the Mueller Report is unable to occur until the Court resumes its normal operations on April 20, 2020, unless the Court's normal operations are further suspended due to the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 30, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-04-17116NOTICE CONCERNING IN CAMERA REVIEW OF MUELLER REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Davisson, John) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-22MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on June 18, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., which shall serve as a target date for the resolution of the parties' summary judgment motions. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 22, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-24Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-29117MANDATE of USCA as to 34 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON ; USCA Case Number 19-5121. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-04-29118NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. Attorney Marc Rotenberg terminated. (Davisson, John) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-05-04119NOTICE of Factual Developments Relevant to Pending Motions by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(Davisson, John) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-06-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiffs' 119 Notice of Factual Developments Relevant to Pending Motions, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before June 12, 2020, the United States Department of Justice shall file its response to the plaintiffs' notice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 1, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 6/12/2020 (hs) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-08120ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for June 18, 2020, is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that, on July 20, 2020, at 9:30 a.m., the Department shall appear before the Court for an ex parte hearing to address the Court's questions regarding certain redactions of the Mueller Report. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 8, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-09Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-12121RESPONSE re 119 Notice (Other) filed by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-19122NOTICE of Reprocessed Report by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 121 Response to Document (Attachments: # 1 Volume I, # 2 Volume II, # 3 Appendices)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-07-06123ORDER. In accordance with the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 14, 2020, at 5:00 p.m., the Department shall file under seal its responses to the Court's questions by completing Column G of Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 6, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2020: # 1 Exhibit) (ztnr). (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Response due by 7/14/2020 (hs) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-10124MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Court's Order Concerning Redactions , MOTION to Expedite Ruling on this Motion for a One-Week Extension of Time by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 124 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time and Request for Expedited Ruling, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 21, 2020, at 5:00 p.m., the defendant shall file under seal its responses to the questions posed by the Court in Exhibit A of the Court's July 6, 2020 Order. It is further ORDERED that the ex parte hearing currently scheduled for July 20, 2020, is CONTINUED to August 17, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 13, 2020. (lcrbw1) Modified on 7/13/2020 to include time of hearing (lcrbw1). (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-13Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 8/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-21125SEALED DOCUMENT filed by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 123 Order, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-21126NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 123 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vanessa Brinkmann)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-08-13MINUTE ORDER. In light of Chief Judge Howell's August 10, 2020 Order, In re: Fourth Further Extension of Postponed Court Proceedings Due to Ongoing Exigent Circumstances Caused by COVID-19 Pandemic, Standing Order No. 20-68 (BAH), it is hereby ORDERED that the ex parte hearing currently scheduled for August 17, 2020, is CONTINUED to September 15, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 13, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-13Set/Reset Hearings: Ex Parte Hearing reset for 9/15/2020 at 02:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-09-14MINUTE ORDER. To minimize the risks associated with COVID-19, it is hereby ORDERED that the United States Department of Justice shall appear before the Court for the ex parte hearing currently scheduled for September 15, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). The Clerk of the Court shall provide counsel with the security code required to access the ex parte hearing. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 14, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Ex Parte Status Conference held on 9/15/2020. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-18127NOTICE OF FILING UNSEALED SUBMISSION OF CERTAIN RESPONSES TO COURT ORDER by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 125 Sealed Document, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-18128SEALED DOCUMENT filed by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 125 Sealed Document, Status Conference (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vanessa Brinkmann)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-22129NOTICE of Filing Public Version of Declaration in Response to Court's Questions During Ex Parte Hearing by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 128 Sealed Document, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vanessa Brinkmann (public version))(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-30130MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 30, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-30131ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion issued on this same date, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's March 5, 2019 Order is VACATED to the extent that it denied without prejudice the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that the 54 Department of Justice's Motion for Summary Judgment in Leopold v. Department of Justice and Partial Summary Judgment in Electronic Privacy Information Center v. Department of Justice is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED with respect to the Department's withholdings pursuant to Exemptions 3, 7(A), 7(C), and 7(E). The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the balance of the 71 Plaintiff's Combined Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Motion for In Camera Review of the "Mueller Report" is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks disclosure of the information withheld pursuant to Exemption 5. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the balance of 73 Plaintiffs Jason Leopold's and Buzzfeed Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks disclosure of the information withheld pursuant to Exemption 5. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that, on October 22, 2020, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). It is further ORDERED that, on or before November 2, 2020, the Department shall produce to the plaintiffs an updated redacted version of the Mueller Report, which discloses the information redacted pursuant to Exemption 5, unless such information has been properly withheld pursuant to another exemption. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 30, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-30Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 12:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(hs) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-02134MOTION to Intervene by LEONARD W. HOUSTON (ztd); ("Leave to file is granted, although the Court never received his original motion." signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton 10/02/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-08132Emergency MOTION for Order by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-08133ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 8, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-09Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Reply in support of its motion due by 10/14/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2020 at 11:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(hs) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-13135Memorandum in opposition to re 132 Emergency MOTION for Order filed by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of G. Bradley Weinsheimer)(Enlow, Courtney) Modified docket event/text on 10/14/2020 (eg). (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-14136REPLY to opposition to motion re 132 Emergency MOTION for Order filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-16MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for the motion hearing currently scheduled for October 16, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). The Clerk of the Court will provide counsel with a security code required to access the teleconference. Members of the public are advised to dial in by calling 1-888-557-8511 and entering the public access code (4140864). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 16, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-16Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2020 re (132 in 1:19-cv-00810-RBW) Emergency MOTION for Order filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD, (102 in 1:19-cv-01278-RBW) Emergency MOTION for Order filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. Motion Hearing continued for 10/21/2020 at 11:30 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-16137ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 16, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-20138NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 137 Order (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-21Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2020. Plaintiff's 132 in 1:19-cv-00810-RBW Emergency MOTION for Order filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD, and 102 in 1:19-cv-01278-RBW Emergency MOTION for Order filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.; heard and denied. A written order will issue from Chambers. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-22139ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 22, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-22140RESPONSE re 134 MOTION to Intervene filed by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-23MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional information before addressing the request made by the Electronic Privacy Information Center and the Department of Justice in their 114 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that on October 28, 2020, at 12:30 p.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). The Clerk of Court will provide counsel with a security code required to access the teleconference. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 23, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-26141TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on October 21, 2020; Page Numbers: 1 - 17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, th e transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2021.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-28Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 10/28/2020. Status Report due by 12/3/2020. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-28142ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 28, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-11-02143NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order by DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 131 Order,,,,,,,, (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-30144NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to (131 in 1:19-cv-00810-RBW) Order,,,,,,,, by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(Topic, Matthew) Modified on 11/30/2020 (ztd). (Fee paid in member case 19-cv-00957 at docket entry 32 receipt number ADCDC-7880474. Fee Status: Fee Paid) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-01145Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 144 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. Fee paid in member case 19-cv-00957 at docket entry 32 receipt number ADCDC-7880474. (ztth) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-03146Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Davisson, John) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-04147Letter from LEONARD W. HOUSTON "Leave to file is granted." By Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/4/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-04148MOTION to Intervene by LEONARD W. HOUSTON. Leave to file is granted. See docket entry 147 . (ztth) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-07MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of Leonard Houston's 148 Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before December 18, 2020, the United States Department of Justice shall file its renewed opposition to Mr. Houston's motion. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 7, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/18/2020 Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00810-RBW, 1:19-cv-00957-RBW(hs) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-08USCA Case Number 20-5364 for 144 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 146 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before January 28, 2021, regarding the status of their negotiations regarding attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 10, 2020. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2021 (hs) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-10149RESPONSE re 148 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2021-01-12150REPLY to opposition to motion re 148 MOTION to Intervene filed by LEONARD W. HOUSTON. "Leave to file is granted" by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/12/2021. (ztth) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar